Lans v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Avery Lans
Defendant: Custom and Border Protection and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv01806
Filed: September 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 08:1324
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Noted #11 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/9/2019. (AGF)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION Proof of Service filed by Allan A. Rivera-Fernandez on behalf of Avery Lans Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rivera-Fernandez, Allan)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (Docket No. 8), this case is transferred to the docket of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi, who has consented to said transfer for consolidation with lead case 19-cv-1165-GAG (see, 19-cv-1165-GAG at Docket No. 12). Signed by Clerk on 09/19/2019. (gr)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Consolidate Cases, subject to Judge Gelpi's consent. As such, the Parties are instructed to file a motion to consolidate in Civ. No. 19-1165(GAG), if they have not done this already. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/17/2019. (MQ)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Allan A. Rivera-Fernandez on behalf of Avery Lans Responses due by 10/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Fernandez, Allan)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion /Response in Opposition of Complaint for Return of Seized Property RE: Docket Number 1 filed by United States of America Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Avery Lans filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Martorani-Dale, David)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David O. Martorani-Dale on behalf of United States of America (Martorani-Dale, David)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Avery Lans upon United States of America served on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Rivera-Fernandez, Allan)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Custom and Border Protection, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (vdm)
September 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Custom and Border Protection, United States of America ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6568072.), filed by Avery Lans. Service due by 12/2/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Category Sheet, #12 Summons CBP, #13 Summons USA)(Rivera-Fernandez, Allan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lans v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avery Lans
Represented By: Allan A. Rivera-Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Custom and Border Protection
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: David O. Martorani-Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?