Ansbacher (Bahamas) Ltd et al v. Bancredito International Bank and Trust Corporation
Plaintiff: Lyford International Bank LTD and Ansbacher (Bahamas) Ltd
Defendant: Bancredito International Bank and Trust Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv01808
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 JUDGMENT. Pursuant to Plaintiffs, ANSBACHER (BAHAMAS) LTD., a Commonwealth of The Bahamas company, and LYFORD INTERNATIONAL BANK LTD., a Commonwealth of The Bahamas company's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice (Dkt. No. #11 ) as provided in Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the Court DISMISSES the instant case WITH PREJUDICE. THIS CASE IS NOW CLOSED FOR ALL ADMINISTRATIVE AND STATISTICAL PURPOSES. IT IS SO ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/7/2019. (EA)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER noting #11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice. Judgment of dismissal is to be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/7/2019. (EA)
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice by Ansbacher (Bahamas) Ltd, Lyford International Bank LTD (Berkan, Judith)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant is to answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 10/21/2019. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/23/2019. (EA)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/21/2019 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Ansbacher (Bahamas) Ltd, Lyford International Bank LTD filed by Isabel Torres-Sastre on behalf of Bancredito International Bank and Trust Corporation Responses due by 10/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Torres-Sastre, Isabel)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear PHV. The Court, having considered William M. Tuttle's Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiffs, Ansbacher (Bahamas) LTD and Lyford International Bank LTD, orders that the application be GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall deposit the admission fee to the account of Non-Appropriated Funds of the Court. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 9/4/2019. (EA)
September 4, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to allow William Tuttle to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6571815) filed by Judith Berkan on behalf of Ansbacher (Bahamas) Ltd, Lyford International Bank LTD Responses due by 9/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Berkan, Judith)
September 4, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement byAnsbacher (Bahamas) Ltd, Lyford International Bank LTD. (Berkan, Judith)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ansbacher (Bahamas) Ltd, Lyford International Bank LTD upon Bancredito International Bank and Trust Corporation served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Berkan, Judith)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Bancredito International Bank and Trust Corporation (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
August 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits - Summons - re #1 COMPLAINT. (Berkan, Judith) Modified on 8/29/2019 as to event(gav).
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bancredito International Bank and Trust Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6562074.), filed by Ansbacher (Bahamas) Ltd, Lyford International Bank LTD. Service due by 11/25/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-J, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Berkan, Judith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ansbacher (Bahamas) Ltd et al v. Bancredito International Bank and Trust Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyford International Bank LTD
Represented By: Judith Berkan
Represented By: William M. Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ansbacher (Bahamas) Ltd
Represented By: Judith Berkan
Represented By: William M. Tuttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bancredito International Bank and Trust Corporation
Represented By: Isabel Torres-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?