DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc v. Roig-Alicea
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc
Defendant: Norma Iris Roig-Alicea
Case Number: 3:2019cv01831
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc upon Norma Iris Roig-Alicea served on 9/13/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (Latimer-Valentin, Roberto)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Latimer-Valentin, Roberto)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Norma Iris Roig-Alicea (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Norma Iris Roig-Alicea, filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc.(Latimer-Valentin, Roberto)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norma Iris Roig-Alicea ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6571330.), filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. Service due by 12/3/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit note with blank allonge, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet)(Latimer-Valentin, Roberto)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc v. Roig-Alicea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norma Iris Roig-Alicea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc
Represented By: Roberto C. Latimer-Valentin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?