Cintron et al v. Hospital Comunitario El Buen Samaritano, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Nieves, Alba Cintron, Vivianna Nieves, Vivianna Nieves-Cintron, Michelle Nieves-Cintron and Alba I. Cintron
Defendant: Hospital El Buen Samaritano, Inc., Insurance Companies W & X, Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc., Corporations Y & Z and Hospital Comunitario El Buen Samaritano, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01850
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: See attached. Joint Proposed Schedule due by 11/14/2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/4/2019. (ebb)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, filed by Marta E. Vila-Baez on behalf of Defendant Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc..(Vila-Baez, Marta)
October 30, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint, filed by Jeanette Rodriguez-De Leon on behalf of Defendant Hospital Comunitario El Buen Samaritano, Inc..(Rodriguez-De Leon, Jeanette)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Noting and Granting #9 "Notice of Appearance and for Extension of Time." Appearing party shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 11/04/2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/03/2019. (LMR)
October 3, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Corporations Y & Z, Hospital Comunitario El Buen Samaritano, Inc., Insurance Companies W & X, Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc., filed by Alba I. Cintron, Michelle Nieves-Cintron, Vivianna Nieves-Cintron.(Rodriguez-Velez, Paul)
October 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear , MOTION for extension of time until November 4, 2019 to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Marta E. Vila-Baez on behalf of Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc. Responses due by 10/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vila-Baez, Marta)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Noting and Granting #7 "Notice of Appearance and for Extension of Time." Appearing party shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 10/30/2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/01/2019. (LMR)
September 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear and Requesting Extension of Time to Plead filed by Jeanette Rodriguez-De Leon on behalf of Hospital Comunitario El Buen Samaritano, Inc. Responses due by 10/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rodriguez-De Leon, Jeanette)
September 13, 2019 ***SEE IMAGE ON #4 *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc. served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (mr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE as to Summos Returned Executed for Hospital Buen Samaritano Inc. by Alba I. Cintron, Michelle Nieves-Cintron, Vivianna Nieves-Cintron (Rodriguez-Velez, Paul)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Noting #3 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 9/12/2019. (ebb)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE Summons Returned Executed as to Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc. by Alba I. Cintron, Michelle Nieves-Cintron, Vivianna Nieves-Cintron (Labadie, Glenda)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Glenda Labadie on behalf of Alba I. Cintron, Michelle Nieves-Cintron, Vivianna Nieves-Cintron (Labadie, Glenda)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Hospital El Buen Samaritano, Inc., Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
September 11, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (ad)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Corporations Y & Z, Hospital El Buen Samaritano, Inc., Insurance Companies W & X, Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6580308.), filed by Alba Cintron, Michelle Nieves, Vivianna Nieves. Service due by 12/9/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Rodriguez-Velez, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cintron et al v. Hospital Comunitario El Buen Samaritano, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital El Buen Samaritano, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Companies W & X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Hospital Guaynabo, Inc.
Represented By: Marta E. Vila-Baez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporations Y & Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital Comunitario El Buen Samaritano, Inc.
Represented By: Jeanette Rodriguez-De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Nieves
Represented By: Paul Rodriguez-Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alba Cintron
Represented By: Paul Rodriguez-Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivianna Nieves
Represented By: Paul Rodriguez-Velez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivianna Nieves-Cintron
Represented By: Paul Rodriguez-Velez
Represented By: Glenda Labadie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Nieves-Cintron
Represented By: Paul Rodriguez-Velez
Represented By: Glenda Labadie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alba I. Cintron
Represented By: Paul Rodriguez-Velez
Represented By: Glenda Labadie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?