HIBISCUSPR 332, LLC v. Lorenzo Orama et al
Plaintiff: HIBISCUSPR 332, LLC
Defendant: Jane Doe, Michael Gabriel Lorenzo Gonzalez, John Doe, Michael Lorenzo Del Valle, Steven Lorenzo Gonzalez, Ramon Lorenzo Orama, Oneida Lorenzo Del Valle, Giselle Lorenzo Del Valle, Michael Lorenzo-Del Valle, M.G.L.G., S.L.G., Oneida Lorenzo-Del Valle, Ramon Lorenzo-Orama, Giselle Lorenzo-Del Valle and Elizaida Gonzalez-Torres
Case Number: 3:2019cv01854
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer until December 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/28/2019. (AGF)
October 28, 2019 Filing 16 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Jose Miguel Perez-Villanueva on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 11/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Perez-Villanueva, Jose) Modified on 10/29/2019 to restrict document, names of minors not redacted in the PDF (gmm).
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Noted #13 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/25/2019. (AGF)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Noted #12 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/25/2019. (AGF)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION Submitting Corrected Page 8 of Verified Complaint re: #1 Complaint,,, filed by HIBISCUSPR 332, LLC filed by Lina M. Soler-Rosario on behalf of HIBISCUSPR 332, LLC Responses due by 11/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Sworn Statement)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Soler-Rosario, Lina)
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION Submitting Proving Service of Summons filed by Lina M. Soler-Rosario on behalf of HIBISCUSPR 332, LLC Responses due by 11/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Soler-Rosario, Lina)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Noted #10 INFORMATIVE motion; Granting as requested #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/9/2019. (AGF)
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** INFORMATIVE Motion, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Jose Miguel Perez-Villanueva on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 10/23/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Villanueva, Jose) Modified on 10/10/2019 to add restriction since case involves minors and filer did not redacted their names (gmm).
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Noted #8 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 9/30/2019. (AGF)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION Submitting Prove of Summons by HIBISCUSPR 332, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2) (Soler-Rosario, Lina) Modified on 9/27/2019 to correct event and title (gmm).
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Elizaida Gonzalez-Torres (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons Elizaida Gonzalez Torres (Soler-Rosario, Lina)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Giselle Lorenzo Del Valle, Michael Lorenzo Del Valle, Oneida Lorenzo Del Valle, Ramon Lorenzo Orama, M.G.L.G., S.L.G. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 ***CASE PARTICIPANTS*** MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Lina M. Soler-Rosario on behalf of HIBISCUSPR 332, LLC Responses due by 9/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Soler-Rosario, Lina) Modified on 9/12/2019 to add restriction since case involves minors and filer did not redacted their names (gmm).
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 ***CASE PARTICIPANTS***COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6583481.), filed by HIBISCUSPR 332, LLC. Service due by 12/10/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Summons Ramon Lorenzo Orama, #9 Summons Oneida Lorenzo Del Valle, #10 Summons Michael Lorenzo Del Valle, #11 Summons Giselle Lorenzo Del Valle, #12 Summons S.L.G, #13 Summons M.G.L.G, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Category Sheet Lina M. Soler Rosario, #16 Category Sheet Nayuan Zouairabani)(Soler-Rosario, Lina) Modified on 9/12/2019 to add restriction since case involves minors and filer did not redacted their names (gmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HIBISCUSPR 332, LLC v. Lorenzo Orama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gabriel Lorenzo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lorenzo Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Lorenzo Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Lorenzo Orama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneida Lorenzo Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giselle Lorenzo Del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lorenzo-Del Valle
Represented By: Jose Miguel Perez-Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.G.L.G.
Represented By: Jose Miguel Perez-Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.L.G.
Represented By: Jose Miguel Perez-Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneida Lorenzo-Del Valle
Represented By: Jose Miguel Perez-Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Lorenzo-Orama
Represented By: Jose Miguel Perez-Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giselle Lorenzo-Del Valle
Represented By: Jose Miguel Perez-Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizaida Gonzalez-Torres
Represented By: Jose Miguel Perez-Villanueva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HIBISCUSPR 332, LLC
Represented By: Lina M. Soler-Rosario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?