VS PR LLC v. ORC Miramar Corporation et al
Plaintiff: VS PR LLC
Defendant: Exelix Construction, Corp., ORC Miramar Corporation, WTB Partners Corp, Osvaldo Rivera-Cruz, Osvaldo Rivera & Associates, P.S.C., District 1, Corp., DT Consulting Engineering Corp., JV Consulting Engineering Corp. and Aldre Development, Corp.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01855
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 First MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/26/2019 to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Docket No. 12) filed by Jean R. Santiago-Cruz on behalf of VS PR LLC Responses due by 11/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Santiago-Cruz, Jean)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jean R. Santiago-Cruz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Santiago-Cruz, Jean)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents, MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/28/2019 filed by Edilberto Berrios-Perez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 11/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Berrios-Perez, Edilberto). Added MOTION for Extension of Time on 10/30/2019 (gmm).
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction as to All Defendants filed by Edilberto Berrios-Perez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 11/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Index to Appendix to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Appendix to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction)(Berrios-Perez, Edilberto)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Noted #10 Notice of Appearance . Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/21/2019. (AGF) Modified on 10/21/2019 to edit document title (gmm).
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE on Behalf of Defendants filed by Edilberto Berrios-Perez on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 11/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Berrios-Perez, Edilberto) Modified on 10/21/2019 to edit title (gmm).
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Noted #8 INFORMATIVE motion. Notwithstanding, the parties are advised that the Courts practice is that the ISC and all discovery matters are referred to a Magistrate Judge. Dispositive motions and trial are not, absent full consent. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/17/2019. (AGF)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 INFORMATIVE Motion Demanding Trial by Jury and other Constitutional Rights by Aldre Development, Corp., DT Consulting Engineering Corp., District 1, Corp., Exelix Construction, Corp., JV Consulting Engineering Corp., ORC Miramar Corporation, Osvaldo Rivera & Associates, P.S.C., Osvaldo Rivera-Cruz, WTB Partners Corp (Berrios-Perez, Edilberto) Modified on 10/17/2019 to correct event and title (mcm).
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Aldre Development, Corp., DT Consulting Engineering Corp., District 1, Corp., Exelix Construction, Corp., JV Consulting Engineering Corp., ORC Miramar Corporation, Osvaldo Rivera & Associates, P.S.C., Osvaldo Rivera-Cruz, WTB Partners Corp (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons re #1 Complaint filed by VS PR LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons Osvaldo Rivera, #2 Summons Exelix, #3 Summons WTB, #4 Summons Dstrict 1, #5 Summons Osvaldo Rivera and Assoc., #6 Summons DT Consulting, #7 Summons Aldre, #8 Summons JV) (Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6584118.) re #1 Complaint filed by VS PR LLC, filed by VS PR LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by VS PR LLC.(Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits re #1 Complaint filed by VS PR LLC (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Colberg-Guerra, Herman)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by VS PR LLC. Service due by 12/10/2019,(Colberg-Guerra, Herman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VS PR LLC v. ORC Miramar Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exelix Construction, Corp.
Represented By: Edilberto Berrios-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORC Miramar Corporation
Represented By: Edilberto Berrios-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WTB Partners Corp
Represented By: Edilberto Berrios-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osvaldo Rivera-Cruz
Represented By: Edilberto Berrios-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osvaldo Rivera & Associates, P.S.C.
Represented By: Edilberto Berrios-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: District 1, Corp.
Represented By: Edilberto Berrios-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DT Consulting Engineering Corp.
Represented By: Edilberto Berrios-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JV Consulting Engineering Corp.
Represented By: Edilberto Berrios-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldre Development, Corp.
Represented By: Edilberto Berrios-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VS PR LLC
Represented By: Herman G. Colberg-Guerra
Represented By: Jean R. Santiago-Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?