Slivinski v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Slivinski and Kenneth Slivinski
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Destileria Serralles, Inc. and Serralles Hotel, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01857
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto on behalf of Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. Responses due by 11/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Soto, Ana)
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Stay Class Certification Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss Complaint filed by Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto on behalf of Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. Responses due by 11/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Perez-Soto, Ana)
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto on behalf of Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. Responses due by 11/22/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Composite))(Perez-Soto, Ana)
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement byHilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.. (Perez-Soto, Ana)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto on behalf of Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. (Perez-Soto, Ana)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to allow Brian Marty to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6675524) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Kenneth Slivinski Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to allow Brandon Bohlman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6675518) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Kenneth Slivinski Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to allow John Barton Goplerud to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6675511) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Kenneth Slivinski Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Cases by Kenneth Slivinski (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons for reissue (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance as Co-Counsel filed by Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Vissepo-Garriga, Jean) Modified on 11/5/2019 to edit docket title (rom).
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Destileria Serralles, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Serralles Hotel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion requesting Order. Clerk shall issue the Summons accordingly. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/28/2019. (wm)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION requesting Order to re-issue corrected summons filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Kevin Slivinski Responses due by 10/24/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Destileria Serralles, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Serralles Hotel, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Destileria Serralles, Inc., Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Serralles Hotel, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6584459.), filed by Kevin Slivinski. Service due by 12/10/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slivinski v. Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Ana Maria Cristina Perez-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Destileria Serralles, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serralles Hotel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Slivinski
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Slivinski
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?