Slivinski v. Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Slivinski and Kenneth Slivinski
Defendant: Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Inter-Continental Hotels Group, Inc., Crowne Plaza OpCo, LP, IHG, PLC and Hospitality Properties Trust
Case Number: 3:2019cv01860
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re #11 Motion to Appear PHV: GRANTED. The Clerk will deposit the admission fee in the Court's non-appropriated funds account. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/08/2019. (brc)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #10 Motion to Appear PHV: GRANTED. The Clerk will deposit the admission fee in the Court's non-appropriated funds account. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/08/2019. (brc)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #9 Motion to Appear PHV: GRANTED. The Clerk will deposit the admission fee in the Court's non-appropriated funds account. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/08/2019. (brc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to allow Brian Marty to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6675546) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Kenneth Slivinski Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 7, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to allow Brandon Bohlman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6675543) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Kenneth Slivinski Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to allow John Barton Goplerud to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6675540) filed by Jane A. Becker-Whitaker on behalf of Kenneth Slivinski Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Notice (Other): NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/07/2019. (brc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Related Cases by Kenneth Slivinski (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Leave to Appear: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/04/2019. (brc)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Co-Counsel filed by Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vissepo-Garriga, Jean)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Crowne Plaza OpCo, LP, IHG, PLC, Hospitality Properties Trust, Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Inter-Continental Hotels Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE Category Sheet by Kevin Slivinski (Becker-Whitaker, Jane)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crowne Plaza OpCo, LP, IHG, PLC, Hospitality Properties Trust, Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation, Inter-Continental Hotels Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6584488.), filed by Kevin Slivinski. Service due by 12/10/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Becker-Whitaker, Jane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slivinski v. Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter-Continental Hotels Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inter-Continental Hotels Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowne Plaza OpCo, LP, IHG, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospitality Properties Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Slivinski
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Slivinski
Represented By: Jane A. Becker-Whitaker
Represented By: Jean Paul Vissepo-Garriga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?