Fernandez-Colon v. The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Alberto Manuel Fernandez-Colon
Defendant: The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Capital Mortgage Services, Corp.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01862
Filed: September 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Restrict; granting #7 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. The Clerk of Court shall appoint new pro bono counsel, who shall meet with Plaintiff to review the legal requirements of the claims filed before this Court, and provide an initial assessment of the viability of these claims and the pro se motions filed by Plaintiff. Counsel may amend the complaint, if needed. Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/21/2019. (MQ)
October 21, 2019 Filing 7 ***EX-PARTE*** MOTION Application for Relief Relief from Pro Bono Appointment re #6 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Alberto Manuel Fernandez-Colon filed by Carlos F. Lopez-Lopez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Lopez-Lopez, Carlos)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Carlos F. Lopez-Lopez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Lopez, Carlos)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL PRO BONO. Counsel Carlos F. Lopez-Lopez appointed to represent Plaintiff: Alberto Manuel Fernandez-Colon (pro-se) re D.E. 4 Order. Signed by Clerk on 9/17/19. Manual Notification sent via regular mail to Plaintiff: Alberto Manuel Fernandez-Colon & Counsel: Carlos F. Lopez-Lopez. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/17/19.(mg)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Counsel shall meet with Plaintiff to review the legal requirements of the claims filed before this Court, and provide an initial assessment of the viability of these claims and the pro se motions filed by Plaintiff. Counsel may seek leave to amend the complaint, if needed. Amended Pleadings due by 11/18/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/16/2019. (MQ)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Alberto Manuel Fernandez-Colon, pro se. Responses due by 9/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Capital Mortgage Services, Corp., The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, filed by Alberto Manuel Fernandez-Colon, pro se. Service due by 12/11/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(mg)
September 12, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alberto Manuel Fernandez-Colon, pro se. Responses due by 9/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez-Colon v. The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Mortgage Services, Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Manuel Fernandez-Colon
Represented By: Carlos F. Lopez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?