Robles-Alvarez v. USA
Petitioner: Delfin Robles-Alvarez
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01884
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice Petitioner's case. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/8/2019. (MQ)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 MOTION to Withdraw re: #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 14-439); denying without prejudice #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 14-439), in light of Petitioner's Motion to Withdraw, Docket No. 3. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/8/2019. (MQ)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Withdraw re: #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 14-439) filed by Delfin Robles-Alvarez, pro se. Responses due by 10/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Related document(s) #1 ). (mg)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER holding in abeyance #1 Motion to Vacate. Response due by 11/18/2019. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/23/2019. (MQ)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 14-439) filed by Delfin Robles-Alvarez, Pro Se. Responses due by 10/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(arg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robles-Alvarez v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Delfin Robles-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?