Espinal-Guzman v. Auto Zone Puerto Rico Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Omar Espinal-Guzman
Defendant: Rosalyn Camacho-La Luz and Auto Zone Puerto Rico Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01886
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting as requested #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 11/12/2019. (AGF)
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 Final MOTION for Extension of Time until November 27, 2019 to file Answer Complaint or otherwise defend filed by Lloyd Isgut-Rivera on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 11/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Isgut-Rivera, Lloyd)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting as requested #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/15/2019. (AGF)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting as requested #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 10/15/2019. (AGF)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 13, 2019 to File Answer To Complaint or Otherwise Defend filed by Lloyd Isgut-Rivera on behalf of Rosalyn Camacho-La Luz Responses due by 10/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Isgut-Rivera, Lloyd)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 13, 2019 to File Answer To Complaint or Otherwise Defend re: #1 Complaint, filed by Omar Espinal-Guzman filed by Lloyd Isgut-Rivera on behalf of Auto Zone Puerto Rico Inc. Responses due by 10/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Isgut-Rivera, Lloyd)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Noted #6 Motion submitting Summons Returned Executed. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 09/30/2019. (CRH)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION Submitting Summons Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons Executed Summons) (Nolla-Acosta, Juan) Modified on 9/30/2019 to correct event and title (gmm).
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint, filed by Omar Espinal-Guzman (Nolla-Acosta, Juan)
September 19, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Auto Zone Puerto Rico Inc., Rosalyn Camacho-La Luz (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6595211.), filed by Omar Espinal-Guzman. Service due by 12/17/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Summons for Auto Zone, #4 Summons Summons for Rosalyn Camacho, #5 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter issued by EEOC)(Nolla-Acosta, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinal-Guzman v. Auto Zone Puerto Rico Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Omar Espinal-Guzman
Represented By: Juan Jose Nolla-Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosalyn Camacho-La Luz
Represented By: Lloyd Isgut-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Zone Puerto Rico Inc.
Represented By: Lloyd Isgut-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?