Greene v. Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Mark Greene
Defendant: Triple-S Propiedad, Inc., A, B and C Corporations, Unknown Insurance Companies A through H and John Does 1, 2 and 3
Case Number: 3:2019cv01896
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #6 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead." Defendant shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 12/12/2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/12/2019. (ebb)
November 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until 12/12/2019 filed by Giancarlo Font-Garcia on behalf of Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. Responses due by 11/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Font-Garcia, Giancarlo)
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Greene upon Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. served on 10/22/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Efron, David)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits : Summons (Efron, David) Modified on 10/21/2019 (mr).
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6597332.), filed by Mark Greene. Service due by 12/18/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Efron, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple-S Propiedad, Inc.
Represented By: Giancarlo Font-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A, B and C Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Insurance Companies A through H
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1, 2 and 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Greene
Represented By: David Efron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?