Garcia v. Servimetal, LLC
Plaintiff: Rebeca Garcia
Defendant: Servimetal, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01900
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Rebeca Garcia (Lopez, Andres)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/13/2019. (wm)
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 Motion to allow Seth Miles to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6661739) filed by Andres W. Lopez on behalf of Rebeca Garcia Responses due by 11/13/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez, Andres)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for extension of time. Dispositive motions will not be considered in lieu of an answer. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/23/2019. (wm)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until November 18, 2019 to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of Servimetal, LLC Responses due by 11/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Rios, Victor)
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios on behalf of Servimetal, LLC (Rivera-Rios, Victor)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rebeca Garcia upon Servimetal, LLC served on 9/27/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Lopez, Andres)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Servimetal, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Servimetal, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6601035.), filed by Rebeca Garcia. Service due by 12/19/2019, (Attachments: #1 Appearance of Counsel, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Summons)(Lopez, Andres)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Servimetal, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servimetal, LLC
Represented By: Victor Manuel Rivera-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebeca Garcia
Represented By: Andres W. Lopez
Represented By: Seth Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?