Esteras-Rosado v. USA
Petitioner: Eduardo Esteras-Rosado
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01901
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Granting #10 "Motion for Extension of Thirty (30) Days to Submit United States' Response to Petitioner's sec. 2255 Motion." Response due not later than December 6, 2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/6/2019. (MPL)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 6, 2019 to File Response/Reply filed by Mariana E. Bauza on behalf of USA Responses due by 11/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bauza, Mariana)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Noting #8 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/7/2019. (ebb)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Ruben Cerezo-Hernandez on behalf of Eduardo Esteras-Rosado Responses due by 10/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cerezo-Hernandez, Ruben)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: #5 "Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 to Vacate, Set Aside, or Correct." The Government shall respond not later than November 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/7/2019. (gmm)
October 7, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #1 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** (mr)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Noting #2 "Notice of Appearance as Counsel of Record" filed by Eduardo Esteras-Rosado. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/4/2019.(cc)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ***FILED in Error- Wrong Entry*** ORDER: Noting #1 "Notice of Appearance as Counsel of Record" filed by Eduardo Esteras-Rosado. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/4/2019.(cc) Modified on 10/7/2019 (mr).
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance as Counsel of Record by Frank A. Rubino on behalf of Eduardo Esteras-Rosado (Rubino, Frank)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 ***FILED IN ERROR. Counsel filed using another counsel's login/password. To be re-filed.*** NOTICE of Appearance as Counsel of Record by Frank A. Rubino on behalf of Eduardo Esteras-Rosado (Rubino, Frank) Modified on 10/7/2019 (mr).
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 Memorandum of Law in Support of #5 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 14-726-PAD-10) filed by Eduardo Esteras-Rosado. (mr)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 14-726-PAD-10) filed by Frank A. Rubino on behalf of Eduardo Esteras-Rosado. Responses due by 10/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esteras-Rosado v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eduardo Esteras-Rosado
Represented By: Ruben Cerezo-Hernandez
Represented By: Frank A. Rubino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?