USA v. One (1) 2000 Ford F-250, license plate 903-821, VIN 1FTNX21F5YEA43554; and One (1) 1997 Hydra Sports vessel, Registration No. PR4057GG with two (2) Yamaha 300 outboard engines and One (1) trailer
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: One (1) 2000 Ford F-250, license plate 903-821, VIN 1FTNX21F5YEA43554; and One (1) 1997 Hydra Sports vessel, Registration No. PR4057GG with two (2) Yamaha 300 outboard engines and One (1) trailer
Case Number: 3:2019cv01919
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 Warrant of Arrest In Rem Issued to arrest/release property as to One (1) 2000 Ford F-250, license plate 903-821, VIN 1FTNX21F5YEA43554; and One (1) 1997 Hydra Sports vessel, Registration No. PR4057GG with two (2) Yamaha 300 outboard engines and One (1) trailer. (Attachments: #1 Warrant in Rem) (ad)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #5 Motion to Stay. Granted. Proceedings are stayed until January 3, 2020 by which date the government shall inform on case status and/or need to extend the stay. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/6/2019. (wm)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/6/2019. (wm)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion to Restrict. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/6/2019. (wm)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Stay Civil Forfeiture Proceedings filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 10/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 10/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 ***EX-PARTE***AFFIDAVIT re #2 MOTION to Restrict Document by USA. (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera on behalf of USA Responses due by 10/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture In Rem against One (1) 2000 Ford F-250, license plate 903-821, VIN 1FTNX21F5YEA43554; and One (1) 1997 Hydra Sports vessel, Registration No. PR4057GG with two (2) Yamaha 300 outboard engines and One (1) trailer, filed by USA. Service due by 12/24/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Gonzalez-Rivera, Maritza)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. One (1) 2000 Ford F-250, license plate 903-821, VIN 1FTNX21F5YEA43554; and One (1) 1997 Hydra Sports vessel, Registration No. PR4057GG with two (2) Yamaha 300 outboard engines and One (1) trailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Maritza Gonzalez-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One (1) 2000 Ford F-250, license plate 903-821, VIN 1FTNX21F5YEA43554; and One (1) 1997 Hydra Sports vessel, Registration No. PR4057GG with two (2) Yamaha 300 outboard engines and One (1) trailer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?