Angulo v. Delta Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Erika Angulo
Defendant: Delta Airlines, Inc., ABC Corporations, Jane Doe, XYZ Companies, Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Inc. and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv01929
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER noted #3 Motion submitting. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/6/2019. (wm)
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Inc., Delta Airlines, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
September 27, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Submitting Initial Documents and Summonses re: #1 Complaint filed by Erika Angulo filed by Rafael G. Martinez-Geigel on behalf of Erika Angulo Responses due by 10/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Initial Document, #2 Category Sheet Initial Document, #3 Summons Summons Delta Airlines Inc, #4 Summons Summons Allianz)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Martinez-Geigel, Rafael)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 Payment of Electronic Filing Fee( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6612354.) re #1 Complaint filed by Erika Angulo, filed by Erika Angulo. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Erika Angulo.(Martinez-Geigel, Rafael)
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Erika Angulo. Service due by 12/26/2019,(Martinez-Geigel, Rafael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angulo v. Delta Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Airlines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Angulo
Represented By: Rafael G. Martinez-Geigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?