Pellot-Lopez et al v. Weston Solutions Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Pellot-Plaza, Ileana Plaza-Paredes and Jorge Pellot-Lopez
Defendant: Gena A Good, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Weston Solutions Inc. and Gena Ann Good
Case Number: 3:2019cv01931
Filed: September 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jorge Pellot-Lopez, Conjugal Partnership Pellot-Plaza, Ileana Plaza-Paredes. Weston Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 9/30/2019, answer due 12/2/2019. (Fernandez-Perez, Elias)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gena A Good, Liberty Mutual Insurance, Weston Solutions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
September 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6613697.), filed by Jorge Pellot-Lopez, Conjugal Partnership Pellot-Plaza, Ileana Plaza-Paredes. Service due by 12/30/2019, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Gena, #4 Summons Liberty, #5 Summons WS)(Fernandez-Perez, Elias)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pellot-Lopez et al v. Weston Solutions Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gena A Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weston Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gena Ann Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Pellot-Plaza
Represented By: Elias L. Fernandez-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ileana Plaza-Paredes
Represented By: Elias L. Fernandez-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Pellot-Lopez
Represented By: Elias L. Fernandez-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?