Vicario- Ortiz et al v. Dorado Health, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ariana Vicario- Ortiz, Maryluz Vicario-Ortiz and Ariana Vicario-Ortiz
Defendant: Jane Doe, SIMED, Patty Poe, John Doe, Dorado Health, Inc. d/b/a Manati Medical Center, Companies A-Z, Dr. Jose R Soto-Santiago, Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company, Continental Insurance Company, Conjugal Partnership Soto-Doe, The Medical Protective Company and Dorado Health, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01933
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Defendant Dr. Jose R Soto-Santiago.(Laffitte, Miguel)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #31 Motion for Leave to Appear: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/13/2019. (brc)
November 13, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Maria T. Bustelo-Garcia on behalf of Dorado Health, Inc. Responses due by 11/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bustelo-Garcia, Maria)
November 12, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #29 MOTION for Leave to Appear . ***FILED IN ERROR. Filed in wrong case.*** (ab)
November 12, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint filed by Maria T. Bustelo-Garcia on behalf of Defendant Dorado Health, Inc..(Bustelo-Garcia, Maria)
November 12, 2019 Filing 29 ***FILED IN ERROR. Filed in wrong case*** MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Maria T. Bustelo-Garcia on behalf of Dorado Health, Inc. Responses due by 11/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Bustelo-Garcia, Maria) Modified on 11/13/2019 (ab).
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re #27 Waiver of Service Executed: NOTED. Answer by defendant The Medical Protective Company must be filed no later than December 30, 2019. No extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/04/2019. (brc)
November 4, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Maryluz Vicario-Ortiz, Ariana Vicario-Ortiz. The Medical Protective Company waiver sent on 10/31/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer to amended complaint due November 21, 2019. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/31/2019. (brc)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #23 Motion for Leave to Appear: NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/31/2019. (brc)
October 31, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #18 Amended Complaint filed by Ariana Vicario-Ortiz, Maryluz Vicario-Ortiz filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Dr. Jose R Soto-Santiago Responses due by 11/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #18 ) (Laffitte, Miguel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Miguel G. Laffitte on behalf of Dr. Jose R Soto-Santiago Responses due by 11/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Laffitte, Miguel)
October 28, 2019 Filing 22 Summons Issued as to The Medical Protective Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 28, 2019 Filing 21 PARTIAL JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice plaintiffs' claims against defendants Continental Insurance Company, SIMED and Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/28/2019. (brc)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #17 Motion for Leave to File: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/25/2019. (brc)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal: NOTED. Plaintiffs' claims against defendants Continental Insurance Company, SIMED and Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company are DISMISSED with prejudice. There being no just reason for delay, partial judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/25/2019. (brc)
October 25, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT First against All Defendants, filed by Maryluz Vicario-Ortiz, Ariana Vicario-Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra)
October 25, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Document First Amended Complaint filed by Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/8/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra)
October 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Continental Insurance, SIMED and PRMD by Ariana Vicario-Ortiz, Maryluz Vicario-Ortiz (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Answer deadline November 12, 2019. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/15/2019. (brc)
October 13, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 12, 2019 to File Answer To Complaint filed by Giovanni Picorelli-Ayala on behalf of Dorado Health, Inc. Responses due by 10/28/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Picorelli-Ayala, Giovanni)
October 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Giovanni Picorelli-Ayala on behalf of Dorado Health, Inc. (Picorelli-Ayala, Giovanni)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Soler-Muniz, Pedro)
October 11, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon SIMED served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Soler-Muniz, Pedro)
October 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Continental Insurance Company served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Soler-Muniz, Pedro)
October 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Dr. Jose R Soto-Santiago served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Soler-Muniz, Pedro)
October 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Dorado Health, Inc. served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Soler-Muniz, Pedro)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Issuance of Summons: GRANTED. The Clerk will issue the summons, as requested. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/02/2019. (brc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company filed by Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Puerto Rico Medical Defense)(Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra)
October 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Soto-Doe, Continental Insurance Company, Jane Doe, Dorado Health, Inc. d/b/a Manati Medical Center, SIMED, Dr. Jose R Soto-Santiago (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6614717.), filed by Maryluz Vicario-Ortiz, Ariana Vicario- Ortiz. Service due by 12/30/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Appearance of Counsel, #4 Summons Summon Dorado Health, #5 Summons Summon Dr. Soto, #6 Summons Summon Jane Doe, #7 Summons Summon CP Soto-Doe, #8 Summons Summon Continental, #9 Summons Summon PRMD, #10 Summons Summon SIMED)(Soler-Muniz, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vicario- Ortiz et al v. Dorado Health, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorado Health, Inc. d/b/a Manati Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Companies A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jose R Soto-Santiago
Represented By: Miguel G. Laffitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Medical Defense Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Soto-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Medical Protective Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorado Health, Inc.
Represented By: Giovanni Picorelli-Ayala
Represented By: Maria T. Bustelo-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariana Vicario- Ortiz
Represented By: Pedro F. Soler-Muniz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryluz Vicario-Ortiz
Represented By: Pedro F. Soler-Muniz
Represented By: Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariana Vicario-Ortiz
Represented By: Pedro F. Soler-Muniz
Represented By: Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?