Wal Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. v. Lanza et al
Plaintiff: Wal Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.
Defendant: L&V Distributors, Insurance Company ABC, Vincent T Frisone, Jr., Dr. John Doe, Edward Lanza and SoCal Distributors LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01934
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Motion for extension of time. Granted as requested. Answer deadline due by 12/16/2019. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/13/2019. (wm)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/13/2019. (wm)
November 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time until December 16, 2019 to familiarize itself with the pleadings and craft a response filed by Daniel Angel Vazquez-Diaz on behalf of Edward Lanza, SoCal Distributors LLC Responses due by 11/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vazquez-Diaz, Daniel)
November 12, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to allow David Levine to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6679412) filed by Daniel Angel Vazquez-Diaz on behalf of Edward Lanza, SoCal Distributors LLC Responses due by 11/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vazquez-Diaz, Daniel)
November 12, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #8 Motion to allow David Levine to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0). ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking pro hac counsel's manual signature. Counsel to re-file.*** (rom)
November 11, 2019 Filing 8 ***FILED IN ERROR: Lacking manual signature*** Motion to allow David Levine to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0) filed by Daniel Angel Vazquez-Diaz on behalf of Edward Lanza, SoCal Distributors LLC Responses due by 11/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vazquez-Diaz, Daniel) Modified on 11/12/2019 (rom).
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wal Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. upon Edward Lanza served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Gierbolini-Gonzalez, Fernando)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wal Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. upon SoCal Distributors LLC served on 10/24/2019, answer due 11/14/2019. (Gierbolini-Gonzalez, Fernando)
October 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando J. Gierbolini-Gonzalez on behalf of Wal Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. (Gierbolini-Gonzalez, Fernando)
October 1, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #2 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR - Counsel filed the PDF in "legal format". PDF shall be corrected to a 8.5 x 11 "letter format" and re-file.*** (gmm)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Vincent T Frisone, Jr, L&V Distributors, Edward Lanza, SoCal Distributors LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 ***FILED IN ERROR-LEGAL FORMAT*** NOTICE of Appearance by Fernando J. Gierbolini-Gonzalez on behalf of Wal Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. (Gierbolini-Gonzalez, Fernando) Modified on 10/2/2019 (gmm).
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Insurance Company ABC, John Doe, Vincent T Frisone, Jr, L&V Distributors, Edward Lanza, SoCal Distributors LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6615863.), filed by Wal Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.. Service due by 12/30/2019, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Edward Lanza, #4 Summons L & V Distributors, #5 Summons SoCal Distributors, #6 Summons Vincent T. Frisone)(Monserrate, Dora)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wal Mart Puerto Rico, Inc. v. Lanza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L&V Distributors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent T Frisone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Lanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SoCal Distributors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wal Mart Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Dora L. Monserrate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?