Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. v. Montanez Service Station, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.
Defendant: Carlos Montanez-Dones, Luis R Casellas-Berrios, Pedro Montanez-Dones, Juanita Torres-Roldan, Conjugal Partnership Montanez-Torres and Montanez Service Station, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01935
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Referring Judge: Bruce J McGiverin
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER noted #39 Joint Motion In Compliance. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 11/20/2019. (jm)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER noted and moot #23 Motion requesting Order. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on November 20, 2019. (McGiverin, Bruce)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER noted #40 INFORMATIVE motion. The preliminary injunction hearing set for November 21, 2019 is VACATED. I deem that the referral to me of the motion for preliminary injunction for a report and recommendation is now MOOT. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on November 20, 2019. (McGiverin, Bruce)
November 19, 2019 Filing 40 Joint INFORMATIVE Motion regarding preliminary injunction hearing filed by Cenia M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 12/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
November 18, 2019 Filing 39 Joint Motion In Compliance as to 35 Order, filed by Cenia M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 35 ) (Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Noting #22 "Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/18/2019. (ebb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 37 ANSWER to #29 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Answer to Counterclaim filed by Santiago Soler-Martinez on behalf of Plaintiff Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp..(Soler-Martinez, Santiago)
November 15, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Support Preliminary Injuction filed by Carlos Montanez-Dones, Pedro Montanez-Dones, Juanita Torres-Roldan Re: #23 MOTION requesting Order granting preliminary injunction filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. filed by Carlos Montanez-Dones, Pedro Montanez-Dones, Juanita Torres-Roldan. (Crespo-Claudio, Pedro)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Preliminary injunction hearing is reset for November 21, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9. Counsel for the parties shall meet IN PERSON by 11/14/19 to try to settle this case. If no settlement is reached, the parties shall file a joint stipulation of facts by 11/18/19. So ordered.Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on November 6, 2019.(McGiverin, Bruce)
November 5, 2019 ***SEE IMAGE ON DOCKET #34 *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. upon Montanez Service Station, Inc. (mr)
November 4, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
November 1, 2019 Filing 33 Motion In Compliance as to 24 Order on Motion requesting Order,, filed by Cenia M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
November 1, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION in Compliance with Court Order by All Plaintiffs upon Montanez Service Station, Inc. served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons Executed - Montaez Service) (Mercado-Santana, Cenia) Modified on 11/4/2019 as to event (mr).
November 1, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION Submitting Certified Translation filed by Cenia M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Translation Docket 1-12)(Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
October 31, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION Submitting Certified Translations re: #1 Complaint,, filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. filed by Cenia M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/14/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Translation of Docket 1-11, #2 Exhibit Translation of Docket 1-13, #3 Exhibit Translation of Docket 1-14, #4 Exhibit Translation of Docket 1-15, #5 Exhibit Translation of Docket 1-16, #6 Exhibit Translation of Docket 1-17, #7 Exhibit Translation of Docket 1-18, #8 Exhibit Translation of Docket 1-19, #9 Exhibit Translation of Docket 1-20, #10 Exhibit Translation of Docket 1-21)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
October 25, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Juanita Torres-Roldan, Pedro Montanez-Dones, Carlos Montanez-Dones filed by Pedro A. Crespo-Claudio on behalf of Defendants Juanita Torres-Roldan, Pedro Montanez-Dones, Carlos Montanez-Dones.(Crespo-Claudio, Pedro)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER noted #18 Motion In Compliance. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 10/24/2019. (jm)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER noted #17 Motion In Compliance. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 10/24/2019. (jm)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #19 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents, MOTION for Extension of Time until October 11, 2019 to file Certified English Translations. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on 10/24/2019. (jm)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER noted #21 Motion submitting. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on October 24, 2019. (McGiverin, Bruce)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER noted #15 Motion requesting Order. Defendants are granted a final term until October 30, 2019 to respond to the motion for preliminary injunction. By not later than 11/5/19, counsel for the parties shall meet IN PERSON to try to settle this case. Preliminary injunction hearing set for November 7, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 9. Plaintiff shall serve defendants with this order forthwith and file a certificate of service. So ordered. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin on October 24, 2019. (McGiverin, Bruce)
October 22, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION requesting Order granting preliminary injunction filed by Santiago Soler-Martinez on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 11/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Soler-Martinez, Santiago)
October 22, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Santiago Soler-Martinez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Soler-Martinez, Santiago)
October 21, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translations as to Dk. 18 filed by Cenia M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 11/4/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert. Translation, #2 Exhibit Cert. Translation)(Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion filed by Carlos Montanez-Dones, Pedro Montanez-Dones, Juanita Torres-Roldan Re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. filed by Carlos Montanez-Dones, Pedro Montanez-Dones, Juanita Torres-Roldan. (Crespo-Claudio, Pedro)
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents , MOTION for Extension of Time until October 11, 2019 to file Certified English Translations filed by Cenia M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
October 7, 2019 Filing 18 Motion In Compliance as to #14 Order,,, Terminate Motions,,, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Resubmitting Request For Temporary Restraining Order filed by Cenia M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Text Messages, #2 Exhibit Email, #3 Exhibit PR Corporate Registry)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
October 4, 2019 Filing 17 First Motion In Compliance with Order as to #14 Order,,, Terminate Motions,, filed by Cenia M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 10/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Summon for Carlos Montaez, #2 Exhibit Executed Summon for Juanita Torres, #3 Exhibit Executed Summon for Pedro Montaez, #4 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING: #15 "Urgent Motion Requesting Amendment to Court Order," to U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/4/2019. (MPL)
October 3, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION requesting Order filed by Cenia M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 10/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: See attached. The request for a Temporary Restraining Order at Docket No. 11 is DENIED. The case is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce J. McGiverin to hold a hearing on the Preliminary Injunction requested and issue a Report and Recommendation. Service of process in accordance with this order is due by noontime on October 7, 2019. Defendants shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by October 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/2/2019.(EMJ)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Granting #12 "Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/2/2019. (EMJ)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Cenia M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 10/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cenia M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 10/16/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. upon Luis R Casellas-Berrios served on 10/1/2019, answer due 10/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Noting #8 "Urgent Informative Motion Regarding Filing of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/2/2019. (MPL)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding filing of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction filed by Cenia M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 10/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #2 "Motion for Leave to File Spanish Language Documents." Certified translations due not later than October 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/1/2019. (MPL)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Luis R Casellas-Berrios, Conjugal Partnership Montanez-Torres, Montanez Service Station, Inc., Carlos Montanez-Dones, Pedro Montanez-Dones, Juanita Torres-Roldan (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons) (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance and Request of Notice by Cenia M. Mercado-Santana on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. (Mercado-Santana, Cenia)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Lee Sepulvado-Ramos on behalf of Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. Responses due by 10/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6615884.), filed by Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.. Service due by 12/30/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit)(Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp. v. Montanez Service Station, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Montanez-Dones
Represented By: Pedro A. Crespo-Claudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis R Casellas-Berrios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pedro Montanez-Dones
Represented By: Pedro A. Crespo-Claudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita Torres-Roldan
Represented By: Pedro A. Crespo-Claudio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Montanez-Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montanez Service Station, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Total Petroleum Puerto Rico Corp.
Represented By: Cenia M. Mercado-Santana
Represented By: Lee Sepulvado-Ramos
Represented By: Santiago Soler-Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?