Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Association of Puerto Rico, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Humana Health Plans of Puerto Rico, Inc., MMM Healthcare, LLC, MCS Advantage, Inc., Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Association of Puerto Rico, Inc. and Triple S Advantage, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01940
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER holding in abeyance #15 MOTION to Intervene; granting #21 Motion to allow Ankur Goel to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100067544) ; granting #22 Motion to allow Sarah Hogarth to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100067544) ; granting #23 Motion to allow Michael Kimberly to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100067544); holding in abeyance #26 MOTION for Joinder as to Request for Intervention Re: #15 MOTION to Intervene; granting in part and denying in part #28 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 16, 2019 to File Response/Reply; granting in part and denying in part #29 MOTION for extension of time; granting in part and denying in part #30 MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/13/2019.(wm)
November 7, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Luis R. Roman-Negron on behalf of Triple S Advantage, Inc. Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Roman-Negron, Luis)
November 7, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for extension of time filed by Diego Rodrigo Melendez-Apellaniz on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc. Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Melendez-Apellaniz, Diego)
November 7, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 16, 2019 to File Response/Reply filed by Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais on behalf of MMM Healthcare, LLC, Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Association of Puerto Rico, Inc. Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Granted as requested. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/6/2019. (wm)
November 5, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Joinder as to Request for Intervention Re: #15 MOTION to Intervene filed by Asociacion de Hospitales de Puerto Rico, Inc., Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc., Mennonite General Hospital, Inc., Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc. filed by Carla S. Loubriel on behalf of San Jorge Children's Hospital Inc. Responses due by 11/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #15 ) (Loubriel, Carla)
October 30, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime Sifre-Rodriguez on behalf of Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc., Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc. (Sifre-Rodriguez, Jaime)
October 29, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance and Request of Additional Time to Plead by Raul Castellanos-Malave on behalf of Dennise Longo-Quinones, Javier Rivera-Rios (Castellanos-Malave, Raul) Modified on 10/30/2019 to edit event (rom).
October 29, 2019 Filing 23 Motion to allow Michael Kimberly to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100067544) filed by Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais on behalf of MMM Healthcare, LLC Responses due by 11/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio)
October 29, 2019 Filing 22 Motion to allow Sarah Hogarth to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100067544) filed by Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais on behalf of MMM Healthcare, LLC Responses due by 11/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio)
October 29, 2019 Filing 21 Motion to allow Ankur Goel to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100067544) filed by Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais on behalf of MMM Healthcare, LLC Responses due by 11/12/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio)
October 28, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis R. Roman-Negron on behalf of Triple S Advantage, Inc. (Roman-Negron, Luis)
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jorge L. Flores-De Jesus on behalf of Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc., Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc. (Flores-De Jesus, Jorge) Modified on 10/30/2019 to correct party (mcm).
October 28, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Luis Sanchez-Betances on behalf of Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc., Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc. (Sanchez-Betances, Luis)
October 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Perez-Seda on behalf of Asociacion de Hospitales de Puerto Rico, Inc., Mennonite General Hospital, Inc. (Perez-Seda, Diana)
October 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance on behalf of Mennonite General Hospital, Inc. and Asociacin de Hospitales de Puerto Rico by Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta on behalf of Mennonite General Hospital, Inc. (Alcover-Acosta, Cesar)
October 24, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene filed by Carla S. Loubriel on behalf of Asociacion de Hospitales de Puerto Rico, Inc., Mennonite General Hospital, Inc., Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc., Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc. Responses due by 11/7/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Loubriel, Carla)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER noted #4 Motion for Leave to Appear. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 10/21/2019. (wm)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Association of Puerto Rico, Inc. upon Dennise Longo-Quinones served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019; Javier Rivera-Rios served on 10/8/2019, answer due 10/29/2019. (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio)
October 8, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez (Docket No. 10), this case has been randomly reassigned to the docket of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon. Signed by Clerk on 10/08/2019. (gr)
October 8, 2019 Filing 11 ***FILED IN ERROR*** MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez (Docket No. 10), this case has been randomly reassigned to the docket of Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Clerk on 10/08/2019. (gr)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall randomly reassign this case to another judge. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 10/8/2019.(om)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order of Recusal entered by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (Docket No. 8), this case has been randomly reassigned to the docket of Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez. Signed by Clerk on 10/07/2019. (gr)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned hereby disqualifies himself from presiding over this matter. The case shall randomly be reassigned immediately to another Article III judge. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 10/7/2019. (EA)
October 7, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Dennise Longo-Quinones, Javier Rivera-Rios (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
October 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Compliance by Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Association of Puerto Rico, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Category Sheet) (Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Diego Rodrigo Melendez-Apellaniz on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc. Responses due by 10/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Melendez-Apellaniz, Diego)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mariacte Correa-Cestero on behalf of MCS Advantage, Inc. (Correa-Cestero, Mariacte)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING. Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 10/4/2019. (arg)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6621268.), filed by Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Association of Puerto Rico, Inc., MCS Advantage, Inc., Triple S Advantage, Inc., MMM Healthcare, LLC, Humana Health Plans of Puerto Rico, Inc.. Service due by 12/31/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Act 90-2019, #2 Exhibit Act 90-2019 Official translation, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Fernandez-De-Lahongrais, Ignacio) Modified on 11/6/2019 to edit docket text (rom).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Association of Puerto Rico, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humana Health Plans of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MMM Healthcare, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCS Advantage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medicaid and Medicare Advantage Association of Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Ignacio Fernandez-De-Lahongrais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triple S Advantage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?