American Board of Internal Medicine v. Salas-Rushford, M.D.
Plaintiff: American Board of Internal Medicine
Defendant: JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. and M.D. Jamie Salas-Rushford
Counter Defendant: Joan M Van Feldt, PEARSON EDUCATION, INC., Richard Doe, Dr. Eric S. Holmboe, John Doe, Dr. Christine K. Cassel, Dr. Richard J. Baron, David L. Coleman, Doctors 1-2800, Lynn O. Langdon, Companies A, B and C and Naiomi P. O'Grady
Case Number: 3:2019cv01943
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER re #198 Motion to Expedite: NOTED. Plaintiff American Board of Internal Medicine, third party defendants and cross defendants will respond to Dr. Salas' objections to the scheduling order no later than December 10, 2019. They may propose their own schedules. The matter will be discussed at the Initial Scheduling Conference scheduled for January 31, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/26/2019. (brc)
November 26, 2019 Filing 198 MOTION to Expedite and other Objections to Current Scheduling filed by Guillermo L. Mena-Irizarry on behalf of Jamie Salas-Rushford Responses due by 12/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Mena-Irizarry, Guillermo)
November 26, 2019 Filing 197 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos A. Rodriguez-Vidal on behalf of American Board of Internal Medicine (Rodriguez-Vidal, Carlos)
November 25, 2019 Filing 196 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose M. Nater-Vazquez on behalf of Jamie Salas-Rushford (Nater-Vazquez, Jose)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER re #194 Motion to Try the Case before Article III Judge : NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/21/2019. (brc) Modified on 11/21/2019 to correct title of motion (ab).
November 20, 2019 Filing 194 MOTION to Try the Case before Article III Judge by Jamie Salas-Rushford. (Mena-Irizarry, Guillermo) Modified on 11/21/2019 to edit title and event (ab).
November 20, 2019 Filing 193 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime A. Salas-Soler on behalf of Jamie Salas-Rushford (Salas-Soler, Jaime)
November 19, 2019 Filing 192 NOTICE of Appearance by Guillermo L. Mena-Irizarry on behalf of Jamie Salas-Rushford (Mena-Irizarry, Guillermo)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 SCHEDULING ORDER/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Discovery due 10/30/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due 3/26/2021. Pretrial/Settlement Conference set for 4/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Jury Trial set for 4/19/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2 before Judge Francisco A. Besosa. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 11/7/2019.(grf)
October 4, 2019 Filing 190 NOTICE TO COUNSEL. (ab)
October 4, 2019 Filing 189 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 2:14-cv-06428. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 188 TEXT ORDER: Defendants Motion for Leave to Request Costs and Attorneys Fees (DE 185) is administratively terminated pending the outcome of Plaintiffs appeal of the Courts March 16, 2017 Order dismissing Plaintiffs copyright infringement claim. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(d)(2)(B) and Local Civil Rule 54.2(a), Defendant may refile the Motion upon disposition of the appeal.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/20/19. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
July 29, 2019 Filing 187 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #185 First MOTION for Leave to File Request for Costs and Attorneys' Fees under the Copyright Act (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
July 22, 2019 Filing 186 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Richard Doe, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #185 First MOTION for Leave to File Request for Costs and Attorneys' Fees under the Copyright Act (WATKINS, CASEY) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #185 First MOTION for Leave to File Request for Costs and Attorneys' Fees under the Copyright Act. Motion set for 8/5/2019 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 185 First MOTION for Leave to File Request for Costs and Attorneys' Fees under the Copyright Act by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
June 27, 2019 Filing 184 USCA Case Number 19-2461 for #183 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE. USCA Case Manager James (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3jk, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
June 25, 2019 Filing 183 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #154 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-9769620. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER Denying #174 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re {173} Order on Motion to Transfer Case. It is further Ordered that the Clerk of the Court shall transfer Salas Rushford's counterclaims and third-party Complaint to the United States District Court for the District of Puerto Rico. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 6/6/2019. (JB, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 181 OPINION. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 6/6/2019. (JB, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 180 Letter from Jaime Salas Rushford re #173 Order on Motion to Transfer Case. (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 20, 2017 Filing 179 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #174 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #173 Order on Motion to (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 13, 2017 Filing 178 RESPONSE re #174 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #173 Order on Motion to. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 27, 2017 Filing 177 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #174 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #173 Order on Motion to, #175 MOTION to Strike #174 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 23, 2017 Filing 176 BRIEF in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #175 MOTION to Strike #174 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 10, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #175 MOTION to Strike #174 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re. Motion set for 11/6/2017 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (cm, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 6, 2017 Filing 175 MOTION to Strike #174 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #173 Order on Motion to by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. Responses due by 10/23/2017 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 25, 2017 Filing 174 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #173 Order on Motion to Transfer Case (Attachments: #1 Brief Objections to transfer order)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 173 OPINION AND ORDER Granting #165 Motion to Transfer Case to DISTRICT OF PUERTO RICO ***CIVIL CASE TERMINATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/8/2017. (JB), [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 TEXT ORDER: The Court hereby terminates the motions to strike (ECF Nos. 134-35, 142) without prejudice as unripe for disposition in light of the pending motions to dismiss and transfer (ECF Nos. 164-65).. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/29/17. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
May 8, 2017 Filing 171 Letter from Jaime Salas Rushford, M.D. re #169 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion,. (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
May 8, 2017 Filing 170 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #165 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Puerto Rico (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
May 8, 2017 Filing 169 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #164 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(c) (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 168 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #164 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(c) - redacted version of sealed filing, pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(c)(4) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 167 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #165 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Puerto Rico (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit to opposition to defendant's motion to sever and transfer, #2 Text of Proposed Order denying defendant's motion to sever and transfer)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
May 1, 2017 Filing 166 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #164 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(c) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 24, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #165 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Puerto Rico , #164 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(c). Motion set for 5/15/2017 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 21, 2017 Filing 165 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Puerto Rico by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 21, 2017 Filing 164 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(c) by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt. Responses due by 5/1/2017 (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in support of Rule 12(c) motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibis to Rule 12(c) motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed form of order re Rule 12(c) motion)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 20, 2017 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #163 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Motion set for 5/15/2017 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 19, 2017 Filing 163 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 10, 2017 Filing 162 Letter from Jaime Salas Rushford, M.D., re: alleged discovery deficiencies re #161 Letter. (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 7, 2017 Filing 161 Letter from the ABIM Parties re discovery deficiencies. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 31, 2017 Filing 160 RESPONSE re #158 Order, #159 Letter. (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Filing 159 Letter from ABIM Parties re Mar. 30, 2017 discovery order re #158 Order,. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER that Plaintiffs shall produce Dr. Luna's testimony regarding Dr. Salas Rushford and the hearing transcript of July 24, 2014. Dr. Salas Rushford shall clearly identify the metadata requested with respect to the exam questions, aside from that which already has been provided, and Dr. Salas Rushford shall respond to Plaintiffs' letter of October 30, 2016 (ECF No. 131)., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/30/17. (cm, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 157 TEXT ORDER: As discussed in the teleconference of March 27, 2017 and consistent with Local Civil Rule 54.2(a), no motion for attorney's fees shall be filed absent leave of Court.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/29/17. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 27, 2017 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 3/27/2017. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 22, 2017 Filing 156 NOTICE by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #103 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,, Order on Motion for Protective Order, of reinstatement of ABIM Parties' motion to dismiss as a motion for judgment on the pleadings (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a teleconference, to be initiated by Plaintiff, on March 27, 2017 at 10:30 AM.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/17/17. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting #76 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's complaint (D.E. 1). The parties are directed to confer with Magistrate Judge Waldor for direction on the continuing adjudication of Jaime Salas Rushford's remaining counterclaims, crossclaims, and third-party claims. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 3/16/17. (cm, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 16, 2017 Filing 153 OPINION. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 3/16/17. (cm, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 1, 2017 Filing 152 Transcript of Proceedings of a Motion Hearing held on 1/11/2017, before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ralph Florio (732-859-6255). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 2/22/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2017. (Miller, S) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 24, 2017 Filing 151 Letter from ABIM et al. re reply concerning schedule. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 23, 2017 Filing 150 Letter from Jaime Salas Rushford replying to ABIM re schedule re #148 Letter. (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 20, 2017 Filing 148 Letter from ABIM re schedule. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 11, 2017 Filing 149 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katharine S. Hayden: Motion Hearing held on 1/11/2017 re #76 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. Opinion RESERVED. (Court Reporter RALPH FLORIO.) (mfg) (Main Document 149 replaced on 1/27/2017) (mfg, ). [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 9, 2017 Filing 147 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE re #142 MOTION to Strike defendant's expert response report (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 8, 2017 Filing 146 Letter from A. Schlafly confirming attendance at oral argument re #76 MOTION to Dismiss . (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 6, 2017 Filing 145 Letter from R. Rivera-Soto re attendance at oral argument on defendant's motion to dismiss re #76 MOTION to Dismiss . (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 TEXT ORDER: The Court will adjourn the conference before Judge Waldor on 1/11/2017 at 3:00 PM. Oral argument on the Motion to Dismiss (d.e #76 ) shall now be set for 1/11/2017 at 10:00 AM before the undersigned. All counsel shall confirm attendance via a letter filed on ECF by the end of business day on 1/9/17. So Ordered by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 1/6/2016. (mfg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 4, 2017 Set Deadlines as to #142 MOTION to Strike defendant's expert response report. Motion set for 1/17/2017 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 3, 2017 Filing 143 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #142 MOTION to Strike defendant's expert response report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Text of Proposed Order, #12 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 23, 2016 Filing 142 MOTION to Strike defendant's expert response report by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE. Responses due by 1/3/2017 (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in support of motion to strike defendant's expert response report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit "A" to memorandum in support of motion to strilke defendant's expert response report, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed form of order re motion to strilke defendant's expert response report)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 13, 2016 Filing 141 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #135 MOTION to Strike plaintiff's expert report (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 12, 2016 Filing 140 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #134 MOTION to Strike defendant's expert reports (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 5, 2016 Filing 139 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #134 MOTION to Strike defendant's expert reports -- response filed under seal because this contains excerpts from a deposition that was marked as confidential in its entirety (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 5, 2016 Filing 138 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #135 MOTION to Strike plaintiff's expert report Confidential and redacted (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Form of order denying defendant's motion to strike expert report)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 5, 2016 Filing 137 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #135 MOTION to Strike plaintiff's expert report Confidential but unredacted (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Form of order denying defendant's motion to strike expert report)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO)NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2), a single, consolidated motion to seal shall be filed within 14 days following the completed briefing of the materials sought to be sealed, or within 14 days following the date on which the last of such materials was filed under temporary seal if the motion is resolved, unless otherwise directed by the Court. [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 29, 2016 Filing 136 NOTICE by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt Notice, consent, and reference of a civil action to a Magistrate Judge (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 18, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #135 MOTION to Strike plaintiff's expert report, #134 MOTION to Strike defendant's expert reports. Motion set for 12/19/2016 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (seb) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 17, 2016 Filing 135 MOTION to Strike plaintiff's expert report by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. Responses due by 12/5/2016 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 - expert report, #3 Exhibit 2 - Appendix A to expert report, #4 Exhibit 3 - Appendix B to expert report, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 17, 2016 Filing 134 MOTION to Strike defendant's expert reports by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Richard Doe, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt. Responses due by 12/5/2016 (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in support of motion to strike defendant's expert reports, #2 Exhibit Ex. A to memorandum in support of motion to strike defendant's expert reports, #3 Exhibit Ex. B to memorandum in support of motion to strike defendant's expert reports, #4 Exhibit Ex. C to memorandum in support of motion to strike defendant's expert reports, #5 Exhibit Ex. D. (Part 1 of 2) to memorandum in support of motion to strike defendant's expert reports, #6 Exhibit Ex. D. (Part 2 of 2) to memorandum in support of motion to strike defendant's expert reports, #7 Exhibit Ex. E to memorandum in support of motion to strike defendant's expert reports, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 133 LETTER ORDER denying #109 Motion for Leave to File the First Amended Answer, Counterclaims, and Third-Party Complaint ; denying #113 Motion for Entry of Default, except that Pearson shall be dismissed as a party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/16/16. (cm ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 132 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 12/6/16 at 1:00 PM. The parties are to work on the stipulated facts for the final pretrial order. A second final pretrial conference will be held on 1/11/17 at 3:00pm before the undersigned. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 11/9/16. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 9, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Final Pretrial Conference held on 11/9/2016. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 31, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 10/31/2016. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 30, 2016 Filing 131 Letter from ABIM re defendant's e-discovery deficiencies re #126 Order. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 130 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a teleconference, to be initiated by Plaintiff, on October 31, 2016 at 11:30 AM.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/27/16. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 19, 2016 Filing 129 Letter from ABIM re scheduling order re 101 Order,,,. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 14, 2016 Filing 128 Letter from Andrew Schlafly re #126 Order. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 10, 2016 Filing 127 Letter from ABIM in response to alleged discovery deficiencies re #125 Letter. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 LETTER ORDER Re; Discovery issues, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/7/16. (cm ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 7, 2016 Filing 125 Letter from Andrew Schlafly re plaintiff's discovery deficiencies. (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 6, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 10/6/2016. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 LETTER ORDER: The Telephone Conference originally set for 10/4/16 is rescheduled to 10/6/2016 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/23/16. (cm ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 21, 2016 Filing 123 RESPONSE re #120 Letter. (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 19, 2016 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #113 First MOTION for Entry of Default (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 19, 2016 Filing 121 ANSWER to Counterclaim and third-party complaint, ANSWER to Crossclaim by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt.(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 15, 2016 Filing 120 Letter from Roberto A. Rivera-Soto re defendant's discovery deficiencies. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 14, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 9/14/2016. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a teleconference, to be initiated by Plaintiff, on October 4, 2016 at 12:30 PM.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/9/16. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #104 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Guillermo L. Mena-Irizarry, Esq., and Jaime A. Salas-Soler, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/8/16. (cm ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 8, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 9/8/2016. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a teleconference, to be initiated by Plaintiff, on Thursday, September 8, 2016 at 4:00 PM.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/7/16. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 6, 2016 Filing 116 Letter from Roberto A. Rivera-Soto re discovery issue (will all exhibits). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. "A", #2 Exhibit Exh. "B", #3 Exhibit Exh. "C", #4 Exhibit Exh. "D", #5 Exhibit Exh. "E", #6 Exhibit Exh. "F", #7 Exhibit Exh. "G")(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 6, 2016 Filing 115 Letter from Roberto A. Rivera-Soto re discovery issue. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. "A", #2 Exhibit Exh. "B", #3 Exhibit Exh. "D", #4 Exhibit Exh. "E", #5 Exhibit Exh. "F", #6 Exhibit Exh. "G")(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 2, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #113 First MOTION for Entry of Default. Motion set for 10/3/2016 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (seb) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 1, 2016 Filing 114 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #109 First MOTION for Leave to File the First Amended Answer, Counterclaims, and Third-Party Complaint (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 1, 2016 Filing 113 First MOTION for Entry of Default by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
August 25, 2016 Filing 112 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #109 First MOTION for Leave to File the First Amended Answer, Counterclaims, and Third-Party Complaint (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
August 19, 2016 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that Statement #111 submitted by Roberto A. Rivera-Soto on 8/18/2016 is not filed pursuant to the Local Rules of this Court. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (seb) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
August 18, 2016 Filing 111 STATEMENT subpoena and return of service addressed to Quaity of Life Laboratories, Inc. by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
August 8, 2016 Filing 110 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #104 Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
August 4, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #109 First MOTION for Leave to File the First Amended Answer, Counterclaims, and Third-Party Complaint. Motion set for 9/6/2016 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
August 2, 2016 Filing 109 First MOTION for Leave to File the First Amended Answer, Counterclaims, and Third-Party Complaint by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 First Amended Answer, Counterclaims, and Third-Party Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
August 2, 2016 Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #104 Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Inadvertently omitted proposed form of order (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
August 1, 2016 Filing 107 BRIEF in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #104 Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to opposition to pro hac vice motion)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 106 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants the request (ECF No. 105) and, accordingly, the motion (ECF No. 104) shall be returnable August 15, 2016.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/5/16. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
June 30, 2016 Filing 105 Letter from Roberto A. Rivera-Soto re adjournment of return date on motion re #104 Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
June 22, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #104 Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 7/18/2016 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
June 21, 2016 Filing 104 Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Andrew L. Schlafly, #2 Certification of Guillermo Meno with Good Standing Certificates, #3 Certification of Jaime Salas-Soler with Good Standing Certificates, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 LETTER ORDER withdrawing #34 Motion to Dismiss, w/out prejudice; granting in part and denying in part #75 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part #95 Motion to Compel; denying as moot #97 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/16/2016. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
June 16, 2016 Filing 102 Transcript of Proceedings of Oral Argument held on June 3, 2016, before Judge CATHY L. WALDOR. Court Reporter/Transcriber KING TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES/ Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the ourt a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 7/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2016. (ek)[Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 TEXT ORDER: A Final Pretrial Conference shall be conducted pursuant to Civil Rule 16(d) on 11/9/16 at 10:00 AM before the Undersigned at the U.S. District Court, 50 Walnut Street, Newark, New Jersey on the 4th Floor in Courtroom 4C. The parties shall submit their joint final pretrial order to the Court no later than five (5) business days before the conference. The Court expects to engage in meaningful settlement discussions at the Final Pretrial Conference. Therefore, trial counsel with full settlement authority must attend the conference, and clients or other persons with full settlement authority must be available by telephone. This does not relieve the parties of their obligation to submit their joint final pretrial order no later than five (5) business before the conference. Amended Scheduling Order: Fact end: 9/15/16; Affirmative expert: 10/17/16; Response: 11/17/16; Expert end: 12/16/16. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 6/6/16. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
June 3, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Oral Argument held on 6/3/2016. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 LETTER ORDER denying #65 Motion for Reconsideration as moot; directs the Clerk to terminate the motion, and grants Defendant leave to file applications for admission pro hac vice consistent with this Order The Court also directs the Clerk to waive or reimburse any fees already paid but otherwise required by Local Civil Rule 101.1(c) in connection with applying for admission pro hac vice in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 62/2016. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
May 31, 2016 Filing 99 Exhibit to #98 Memorandum in Opposition of Motion, by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
May 31, 2016 Filing 98 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #97 Second MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhs. A-I, #2 Exhibit Exhs. J-Q, #3 Certification Cert. of counsel, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
May 31, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #97 Second MOTION for Protective Order . Motion set for 6/20/2016 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
May 26, 2016 Filing 97 Second MOTION for Protective Order by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration pursuant to Local Rule 37.1(b)(1), #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
May 16, 2016 Filing 96 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #95 First MOTION to Compel Discovery by ABIM and Other Relief (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits to ABIM's memorandum in opposition to defendant's motion to compel discovery, etc.)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
May 4, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #95 First MOTION to Compel Discovery by ABIM and Other Relief. Motion set for 6/6/2016 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
May 2, 2016 Filing 95 First MOTION to Compel Discovery by ABIM and Other Relief by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Declaration pursuant to Local Civil Rule 37.1(b)(1), #14 Text of Proposed Order, #15 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 CONSENT ORDER granting request to extend the time to file the Motion to Compel to 5/2/2016; pltf. to file his reply by 5/16/2016, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/28/2016. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 27, 2016 Filing 93 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Compel - Consent Order attached by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 TEXT ORDER: As discussed in today's teleconference, the Court will hold an in-person conference in Courtroom 4C on Friday, June 3, 2016 at 2:30 PM. The parties shall be prepared to meet and confer as well as to argue any outstanding motions or issues. Opening brief on motion to compel due by April 29, 2016; opposition due by May 13, 2016; no replies shall be permitted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/18/16. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 18, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Telephone Conference held on 4/18/2016. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 15, 2016 Filing 91 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #76 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #89 Motion for Leave to File reply brief with Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 4/14/2016. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 12, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #89 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages . Motion set for 5/16/2016 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 11, 2016 Filing 89 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Brief Reply Brief in excess of page length limit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 7, 2016 Filing 88 NOTICE by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #76 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Claims of Unconstitutionality (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 4, 2016 Filing 87 BRIEF in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #76 MOTION to Dismiss (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 4, 2016 Filing 86 Letter from Defendant Jaime Salas Rushford re #82 Letter. (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 31, 2016 Filing 85 Letter. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 30, 2016 Filing 84 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #75 MOTION to Compel (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 28, 2016 Filing 82 Letter re #81 Letter,. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting deft's request to file a consolidated brief in reply to the jointly filed oppositions of Dr. Arora and ABIM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/24/2016. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 23, 2016 Filing 81 Letter from Defendant Jaime Salas Rushford re #63 Order on Motion to Quash,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Certification of Duration of Meet and Confer)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 22, 2016 Filing 80 Letter from Defendant Jaime Salas Rushford re #79 Brief in Opposition to Motion, #78 Brief in Opposition to Motion. (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 21, 2016 Filing 79 BRIEF in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #75 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 21, 2016 Filing 78 BRIEF in Opposition filed by Rajender K Arora re #75 MOTION to Compel (MILLER, MELANIE) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 15, 2016 TEXT ORDER: Granting request for automatic extension (d.e. #77 ); Reset Deadlines as to #76 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion reset for 4/18/2016 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mfg) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 15, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #75 MOTION to Compel . Motion set for 4/4/2016 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 14, 2016 Set Deadlines as to #76 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 4/18/2016 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (JB, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 12, 2016 Filing 77 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #76 MOTION to Dismiss . (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 11, 2016 Filing 76 MOTION to Dismiss by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. Responses due by 3/21/2016 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 10, 2016 Filing 75 MOTION to Compel by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration of Antonio Valiente, Esq., #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit F-1, #10 Text of Proposed Order, #11 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 29, 2016 Filing 74 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #65 MOTION for Reconsideration re #63 Order on Motion to Quash,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,,, #64 Order, (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 27, 2016 Pro Hac Vice counsel, ANTONIO E. VALIENTE-RIVERA, GUILLERMO L. MENA-IRIZARRY and JAIME A. SALAS-SOLER, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 24, 2016 Filing 73 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Jaime A. Salas-Soler to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 24, 2016 Filing 72 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Dora L. Monserrate-Penagaricano to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 24, 2016 Filing 71 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Guillermo L. Mena-Irizarry to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 24, 2016 Filing 70 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Antonio E. Valiente-Rivera to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 22, 2016 Filing 69 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #65 MOTION for Reconsideration re #63 Order on Motion to Quash,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,,, #64 Order, (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 16, 2016 Filing 68 Substitution of Attorney - Attorney MARCO A. GONZALEZ, JR terminated.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 8, 2016 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW LAYTON SCHLAFLY on behalf of JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. (SCHLAFLY, ANDREW) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 8, 2016 Please note that the Transcript #66 was replaced to reflect the correct date. The docket entry was also modified for the same purpose. (mfr) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 5, 2016 Filing 66 Transcript of Proceedings of Status Conference held on January 22, 2016, before Judge CATHY L. WALDOR. Court Reporter/Transcriber KING TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES/ Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 2/26/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/5/2016. (ek) (Main Document 66 replaced on 2/8/2016) (mfr). Modified on 2/8/2016 (mfr). [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 5, 2016 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #65 MOTION for Reconsideration re #63 Order on Motion to Quash,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,,, #64 Order, . Motion set for 3/7/2016 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 3, 2016 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW028454 Re Jaime A. Salas (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 3, 2016 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW028455 Re Antonio E. Valiente (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 3, 2016 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW028453 Dora L. Monserrate-Penagaricano (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
February 3, 2016 Filing 65 MOTION for Reconsideration re #63 Order on Motion to Quash,, Order on Motion for Protective Order,, Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,,, #64 Order, by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of partial reconsideration, #2 Declaration of Dr. Salas Rushford, #3 Declaration of Antonio Valiente, Esq., #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING #47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dora L. Monserrate-Peagaricano, #48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Jaime A. Salas-Soler, Esq., and #49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Antonio E. Valiente Rivera, Esq., filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D., etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/25/2016. (JB, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #40 Motion to Quash; denying #45 Motion for Protective Order; terminating #47 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; terminating #49 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/25/2016. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 4/18/16 at 11:30 AM. Fact end is extended to 5/31/16. Expert deadlines remain to be determined. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 1/22/16. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 22, 2016 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Status Conference held on 1/22/2016, Court reporter: ECR. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 8, 2016 Filing 61 Letter from ABIM in response to defendant's request for leave to file discovery motion. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 7, 2016 Filing 60 Letter from Defendant seeking leave to file discovery application. (GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 14, 2015 Filing 59 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #45 MOTION for Protective Order (GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 11, 2015 Filing 58 BRIEF in Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Pro Hac Vice motions (GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying deft's request to file a sur-reply. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 12/10/2015. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 9, 2015 Filing 56 Letter from M. A. Gonzalez for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss re #36 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #34 MOTION to Dismiss counterclaims and third-party complaint. (Attachments: #1 (proposed brief in sur-reply to Dck. 36))(GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 7, 2015 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dora L. Monserrate-Peagaricano, #48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jaime A. Salas-Soler, Esq., #49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Antonio E. Valiente Rivera, Esq Proposed form of order denying applications for admission pro hac vice/prior form of order denying these applications was posted in error (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 7, 2015 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #45 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order denying motion for protective order)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 7, 2015 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dora L. Monserrate-Peagaricano, #48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jaime A. Salas-Soler, Esq., #49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Antonio E. Valiente Rivera, Esq (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order denying admission pro hac vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order conditionally granting admissions pro hac vice)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 3, 2015 Filing 52 Letter from M.A.Gonzalez, Jr. re: Dck. 45 Motion for Protective Order. (GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an in-person status conference on Friday, January 22, 2016 at 2:00 PM. The parties shall be prepared to meet and confer as well as conduct oral argument with respect to any outstanding motions or discovery disputes. In advance of the conference, the parties shall meet and confer as required by L. Civ. R. 37(a)(1). Amended scheduling order: fact end February 29, 2016.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/3/15. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 2, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Status Conference held on 12/2/2015. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 30, 2015 Filing 50 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, David L Coleman, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #40 MOTION to Quash subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 25, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jaime A. Salas-Soler, Esq., #49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Antonio E. Valiente Rivera, Esq, #47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dora L. Monserrate-Peagaricano. Motion set for 12/21/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 25, 2015 Filing 49 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Antonio E. Valiente Rivera, Esq by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Marco A. Gonzalez, Jr., #2 Certification Antonio Valiente, #3 Exhibit Certificate of good standng (USDC-PR), #4 Exhibit Certificate of good standing (PR), #5 Text of Proposed Order)(GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 25, 2015 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jaime A. Salas-Soler, Esq. by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Certification Jaime A. Salas-Soler, #2 Exhibit Certificate of good standing (USDC-PR), #3 Exhibit Certificate of good stanging (PR), #4 Declaration Marco A. Gonzalez, Jr., #5 Text of Proposed Order)(GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 25, 2015 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Dora L. Monserrate-Peagaricano by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marco A. Gonzalez, Jr., #2 Certification Dora L. Monserrate-Peagaricano, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 23, 2015 Filing 46 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #40 MOTION to Quash subpoenas (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Marco A. Gonzalez, Jr. (with Exhibits))(GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 22, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #45 MOTION for Protective Order . Motion set for 12/21/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 22, 2015 Filing 45 MOTION for Protective Order by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Brief (Letter), #2 Declaration of M.A. Gonzalez, Jr., #3 Exhibit A of Gonzalez Decl., #4 Exhibit B of Gonzalez Decl., #5 Exhibit C of Gonzalez Decl., #6 Exhibit D of Gonzalez Decl., #7 Exhibit E of Gonzalez Decl., #8 Exhibit F of Gonzalez Decl., #9 Declaration of Dr. Jaime Salas Rushford, #10 Exhibit A of Dr. Salas Decl., #11 Text of Proposed Order)(GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 13, 2015 Filing 44 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #34 MOTION to Dismiss counterclaims and third-party complaint (Refiled with TOC/TOA) (GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 TEXT ORDER: D.E. 41, altered brief submitted by defendant, Jamie Salas Rushford, is stricken. Counsel shall file, no later than 5pm Friday, November 13, 2015, a brief identical to the original brief [D.E. 37] filed in opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss, with the sole addition of a table of contents and a table of authorities. Counsel for ABIM may seek leave to file an application for attorneys' fees in the future.. So Ordered by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 11/12/15. (rg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 11, 2015 Filing 42 Letter from ABIM and ABIM individuals re defendant's "corrected" opposition to motion to dismiss re #41 Brief in Opposition to Motion. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 11, 2015 Filing 41 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #34 MOTION to Dismiss counterclaims and third-party complaint (Corrected) (GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 10, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #40 MOTION to Quash subpoenas. Motion set for 12/7/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 10, 2015 Filing 40 MOTION to Quash subpoenas by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, David L Coleman, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt. (Attachments: #1 Brief Memorandum in support of motion to quash subpoenas, #2 Exhibit Exh. A to Memorandum in support of motion to quash subpoenas, #3 Exhibit Exh. B. to Memorandum in support of motion to quash subpoenas, #4 Exhibit Exh. C to Memorandum in support of motion to quash subpoenas, #5 Exhibit Exh. D to Memorandum in support of motion to quash subpoenas, #6 Text of Proposed Order)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 9, 2015 Filing 39 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #34 MOTION to Dismiss counterclaims and third-party complaint letter reply brief (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ORDER: The brief in opposition of the counterclaims and third-party complaint [D.E.34] submitted by defendant, Jamie Salas Rushford, is stricken for failure to provide a table of contents and a table of authorities. The defendant shall refile forthwith. All filing deadlines to remain the same.. So Ordered by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 11/6/15. (rg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
November 2, 2015 Filing 37 BRIEF in Opposition filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #34 MOTION to Dismiss counterclaims and third-party complaint (GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 25, 2015 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM in Support filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt re #34 MOTION to Dismiss counterclaims and third-party complaint Restated memorandum per 10/25/15 text order (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TEXT ORDER: American Board of Internal Medicine and the ABIM individuals' brief in support of their motion to dismiss the counterclaims and third-party complaint [D.E.34] is stricken for failure to provide a table of contents and a table of authorities. American Board of Internal Medicine and the ABIM individuals shall refile forthwith. All filing deadlines to remain the same.. So Ordered by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 10/23/15. (rg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 16, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #34 MOTION to Dismiss counterclaims and third-party complaint. Motion set for 11/16/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 16, 2015 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss counterclaims and third-party complaint by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, Richard J. Baron, Christine K Cassel, David L Coleman, Eric S Holmboe, Lynn O Langdon, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Joan M Van Feldt. Responses due by 11/2/2015 (Attachments: #1 Brief memorandum in support of motion to dismiss counterclaims and third-party complaint with prejudice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed form of order dismissing counterclaims and third-party complaint with prejudice)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 23, 2015 Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 150, receipt number NEW027346 Re Guillermo Mena Irrizary (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 22, 2015 Filing 33 Defendant Dr. Salas Rushford's ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND , CROSSCLAIM against John Doe, Companies A, B and C, Doctors 1-2800, Christine K Cassel, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Pearson Education, Inc., Joan M Van Feldt, Lynn O Langdon, Richard Doe, David L Coleman, Richard J. Baron, Eric S Holmboe, COUNTERCLAIM against AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE, John Doe, Companies A, B and C, Doctors 1-2800, Christine K Cassel, Naiomi P. O'Grady, Pearson Education, Inc., Joan M Van Feldt, Lynn O Langdon, Richard Doe, David L Coleman, Richard J. Baron, Eric S Holmboe by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D..(GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Guillermo Mena-Irrizary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/16/2015. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 12/2/15 at 3:00 PM. Amended Scheduling Order: Answer to be filed: 9/22/15; Defendant Responses to Discovery: 9/30/15; Fact End: 11/23/15. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/16/15. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 16, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Status Conference held on 9/16/2015. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 11, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Guillermo Mena-Irrizary, Esq.. Motion set for 10/5/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 11, 2015 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Guillermo Mena-Irrizary, Esq. by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Marco A. Gonzalez, Jr., #2 Certification Guillermo Mena-Irrizary, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a teleconference, to be initiated by Plaintiff, on Wednesday, September 16, 2015 at 2:45 PM. Parties may contact chambers at 973.776.7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 9/8/15. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 3, 2015 Filing 28 Letter from plaintiff re discovery issues re #23 Letter, #24 Letter. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; denying #17 Motion for Sanctions; denying #18 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 9/2/2015. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
September 2, 2015 Filing 26 OPINION. Signed by Judge Katharine S. Hayden on 9/2/2015. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
August 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold a telephone conference, to be initiated by plaintiff, on 1/5/16 at 1:45 PM. Parties may contact chambers at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 8/14/15. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
August 1, 2015 Filing 24 Letter from plaintiff re defendant's discovery violations re #23 Letter,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant's cover letter and supplemental objections and responses to ABIM's requests for admission)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
July 27, 2015 Filing 23 Letter from plaintiff ABIM re discovery violations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to letter to Magistrate Judge Waldor, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to letter to Magistrate Judge Waldor, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to letter to Magistrate Judge Waldor, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to letter to Magistrate Judge Waldor, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to letter to Magistrate Judge Waldor, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to letter to Magistrate Judge Waldor)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
May 15, 2015 Filing 22 Transcript of Proceedings held on April 6, 2015, before Judge CATHY L. WALDOR. Court Reporter/Transcriber KING TRANSCRIPTION SERVICES/ Sara L. Kern (973-237-6080). Initial Pretrial Conference. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. Redaction Request due 6/5/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/15/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/13/2015. (ek) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 20, 2015 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE re #18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order denying defendant's motion for a stay)(RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 6, 2015 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE re #17 MOTION for Sanctions (with exhibits) (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 8/10/2015 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Amended Pleadings due by 7/30/2015. Fact Discovery due by 9/30/2015.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 4/6/2015. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 6, 2015 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/6/2015. (Court Reporter/Recorder ECR.) (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 2, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings. Motion set for 5/4/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
April 2, 2015 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion for Stay, #2 Declaration of Dr. Salas Rushford, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 17, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #17 MOTION for Sanctions . Motion set for 4/20/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
March 17, 2015 Filing 17 MOTION for Sanctions by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 14, 2015 Filing 16 DECLARATION re #15 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion, by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. (GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 14, 2015 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Declaration Doc. #15 submitted by JAIME A. SALAS RUSHFORD on 1/13/2015 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC OR SCANNED SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 13, 2015 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dr. Jaime Salas Rushford, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Dr. Salas Rushford)(GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 6, 2015 Filing 14 Certification on behalf of AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE Re #13 Brief in Opposition to Motion,. (JACOBS, HARA) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
January 6, 2015 Filing 13 BRIEF in Opposition filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebecca S. Lipner, Ph.D., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(JACOBS, HARA) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 18, 2014 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Motion set for 1/20/2015 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 16, 2014 Filing 12 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 15, 2014 Filing 11 Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 4/6/15 at 10:30 AM. Parties are to submit a Joint Discovery Plan no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/15/14. (tjg, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 12, 2014 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERTO A. RIVERA-SOTO on behalf of AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 12, 2014 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.. Responses due by 12/22/2014 (Attachments: #1 Brief in support of motion, #2 Declaration of Dr. Jaime Salas Rushford, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 12, 2014 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please file a notice of appearance for Mr. Jacobs using Notice of appearance found under "other filing/other documents" This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (nr, ) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 11, 2014 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE. JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. served on 12/11/2014, answer due 1/5/2015. (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 10, 2014 Filing 6 NOTICE by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE Request of Hara K. Jacobs, Esq. to receive electronic notices (RIVERA-SOTO, ROBERTO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
December 10, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by MARCO A. GONZALEZ, JR on behalf of JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. (GONZALEZ, MARCO) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 21, 2014 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Maria F. Garcia* (mfg) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 17, 2014 Filing 3 AO121 Copyright Form filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F) (mfg) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 17, 2014 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE identifying NONE as Corporate Parent.. (mfg) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]
October 17, 2014 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-5995705), filed by AMERICAN BOARD OF INTERNAL MEDICINE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(mfg) [Transferred from njd on 10/4/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Board of Internal Medicine v. Salas-Rushford, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Joan M Van Feldt
Represented By: Roberto A. Rivera-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: PEARSON EDUCATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Richard Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Dr. Eric S. Holmboe
Represented By: Roberto A. Rivera-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Dr. Christine K. Cassel
Represented By: Roberto A. Rivera-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Dr. Richard J. Baron
Represented By: Roberto A. Rivera-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: David L. Coleman
Represented By: Roberto A. Rivera-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Doctors 1-2800
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Lynn O. Langdon
Represented By: Roberto A. Rivera-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Companies A, B and C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Naiomi P. O'Grady
Represented By: Roberto A. Rivera-Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Board of Internal Medicine
Represented By: Roberto A. Rivera-Soto
Represented By: Carlos A. Rodriguez-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIE SALAS RUSHFORD, M.D.
Represented By: ANDREW LAYTON SCHLAFLY
Represented By: MARCO A. GONZALEZ, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Jamie Salas-Rushford
Represented By: ANDREW LAYTON SCHLAFLY
Represented By: MARCO A. GONZALEZ, JR.
Represented By: Jaime A. Salas-Soler
Represented By: Guillermo L. Mena-Irizarry
Represented By: Jose M. Nater-Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?