Marbella Club Homeowners' Association v. Greenspan Adjusters International Inc.
Plaintiff: Marbella Club Homeowners' Association
Defendant: Greenspan Adjusters International Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01944
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents filed by Orlando H. Martinez-Echeverria on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 12/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Echeverria, Orlando)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion To Greenspan Adjusterss Motion To Dismiss In Favor Of Arbitration; And Plaintiffs Counter Request For Entry Of Declaratory Judgment In Accordance With The Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs Re: #4 MOTION to dismiss as to Marbella Club Homeowners' Association filed by Greenspan Adjusters International Inc. filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2a, #3 Exhibit 2b, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Martinez-Echeverria, Orlando)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 11/05/2019. (lir)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until November 21 to Respond to Motion To Dismiss filed by Orlando H. Martinez-Echeverria on behalf of Marbella Club Homeowners' Association Responses due by 11/15/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Martinez-Echeverria, Orlando)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER noted #3 Motion submitting translated documents of removed case. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/24/2019. (lir)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to dismiss as to Marbella Club Homeowners' Association filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Greenspan Adjusters International Inc. Responses due by 11/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Submitting Translated documents of removed case filed by Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez on behalf of Greenspan Adjusters International Inc. Responses due by 11/1/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court Humacao Part, case number HU2019CV01449. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6623788), filed by Greenspan Adjusters International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Translated Complaint, #2 Exhibit Original Complaint, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Colon-Ramirez, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marbella Club Homeowners' Association v. Greenspan Adjusters International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marbella Club Homeowners' Association
Represented By: Orlando H. Martinez-Echeverria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenspan Adjusters International Inc.
Represented By: Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?