Tomas-Roman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Xiomara L. Tomas-Roman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2019cv01947
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time until 01/14/2020 to Complete Initial Assessment with Plaintiff and for Service of Process filed by Cristina Fernandez-Niggemann on behalf of Xiomara L. Tomas-Roman Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Niggemann, Cristina)
October 10, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Attorney Cristina Fernandez appointed for Xiomara L. Tomas-Roman re 4 Order. Signed by Clerk on 10/8/2019.(ab)(by mail: Atty. Cristina Fernandez & Xiomara Tomas)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT. The Clerk will appoint counsel for plaintiff Tomas-Roman pursuant to Local Rule 83L. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/08/2019. (brc)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 10/07/2019. (brc)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Xiomara L. Tomas-Roman, Pro Se. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(ab)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**APPLICATION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Xiomara L. Tomas-Roman, Pro Se. Responses due by 10/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (ab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tomas-Roman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiomara L. Tomas-Roman
Represented By: Cristina Fernandez-Niggemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?