Blanco-Heredia et al v. Nieves et al
Plaintiff: Fernando Blanco, Jorge Nieves, Neida Heredia, Neida M. Heredia, Conjugal Partnership Blanco-Heredia and Fernando L. Blanco
Defendant: Jose Rodriguez-Acevedo, Ramon Ayende-Sanchez, Carlos Cano-Robles, Henry Escalera-Rivera, John Doe, Michelle Hernandez de Fraley, Evelyn Trinidad-Martell, PR Department of Justice, Carlos Cruz-Roman, Insurance Company ABC, Jorge Lisboa-Rosario and Lyonei Romero-Rivera
Case Number: 3:2019cv01952
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 INFORMATIVE Motion, MOTION to dismiss charges as to Jorge Lisboa-Rosario filed by Jorge Lisboa-Rosario, Pro Se. Responses due by 12/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (mcm)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT staying case. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 11/15/2019. (MQ)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Notice of Automatic Stay. This case is stayed pursuant to 48 U.S.C. 2161(a) and 11 U.S.C. 362(a), 922. Any request to lift or vacate the stay must be filed in the bankruptcy court in Bankruptcy Case No. 17-bk-03283 (LTS). Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 11/15/2019. (MQ)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Automatic Stay pursuant PROMESA by Ramon Ayende-Sanchez, Carlos Cruz-Roman, Henry Escalera-Rivera, Michelle Hernandez de Fraley, PR Department of Justice, Lyonei Romero-Rivera, Evelyn Trinidad-Martell (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Tenth Amended Notice, Case Management and Administrative Procedures) (Ramirez-Ortiz, Juan)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ramon Ayende-Sanchez, Carlos Cano-Robles, Carlos Cruz-Roman, Henry Escalera-Rivera, Michelle Hernandez de Fraley, Jorge Lisboa-Rosario, Jorge Nieves, PR Department of Justice, Jose Rodriguez-Acevedo, Lyonei Romero-Rivera, Evelyn Trinidad-Martell (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Category Sheet (arg)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jorge Nieves et al, ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6628671.), filed by Fernando L. Blanco, Neida M. Heredia and Conjugal Partnership Blanco-Heredia. Service due by 1/6/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Ayende, #4 Summons Cano, #5 Summons Cruz, #6 Summons Escalera, #7 Summons Hernandez, #8 Summons Lisboa, #9 Summons Nieves, #10 Summons Rodriguez, #11 Summons Romero, #12 Summons Secretary of Justice, #13 Summons Trinidad)(Mendoza-Toro, Lilliam) Modified on 10/9/2019 to edit docket text. (mg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanco-Heredia et al v. Nieves et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Blanco
Represented By: Lilliam E. Mendoza-Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Nieves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neida Heredia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neida M. Heredia
Represented By: Lilliam E. Mendoza-Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Blanco-Heredia
Represented By: Lilliam E. Mendoza-Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando L. Blanco
Represented By: Lilliam E. Mendoza-Toro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Rodriguez-Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Ayende-Sanchez
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Cano-Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Escalera-Rivera
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Hernandez de Fraley
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Trinidad-Martell
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PR Department of Justice
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Cruz-Roman
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Lisboa-Rosario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyonei Romero-Rivera
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?