Ortiz et al v. Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park et al
Plaintiff: MANUEL ORTIZ, A.R.O Minor, DIANA ORTIZ, Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Ortiz and A.R.O.
Defendant: Universal Insurance Company, Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Oro Verde, Inc., Company XYZ, Oroverde Corp., Dr. John Doe, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Doe, Insurance Company ABC, Toro Verde Corp. and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv01972
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time to TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company Responses due by 12/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 11/18/2019. (lir)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR, OTHERWISE, PLEAD filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
November 7, 2019 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR, OTHERWISE, PLEAD, #5 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR. As per filer's request. Wrong name of party in PDF*** (gmm)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 ***FILED IN ERROR-WRONG DOCUMENT**** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR, OTHERWISE, PLEAD filed by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company Responses due by 11/21/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) Modified on 11/7/2019 (gmm).
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 ***FILED IN ERROR-WRONG DOCUMENT*** NOTICE of Appearance by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company (Lamas-Rivera, Jose) Modified on 11/7/2019 (gmm).
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park served on 10/25/2019, answer due 11/15/2019; Universal Insurance Company served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park, Universal Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6637238.), filed by MANUEL ORTIZ, A.R.O Minor, DIANA ORTIZ. Service due by 1/13/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Rodriguez-Lopez, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz et al v. Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MANUEL ORTIZ
Represented By: Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.O Minor
Represented By: Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA ORTIZ
Represented By: Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conjugal Partnership Ortiz-Ortiz
Represented By: Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.R.O.
Represented By: Luis M. Rodriguez-Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Insurance Company
Represented By: Jose J. Lamas-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toro Verde Eco Adventure Park
Represented By: Jose J. Lamas-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oro Verde, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Company XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oroverde Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe-Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company ABC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toro Verde Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?