Figueroa-Vazquez v. Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico et al
Petitioner: Pablo J. Figueroa-Vazquez
Respondent: Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico and Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion de Puerto Rico
Case Number: 3:2019cv01980
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Juan M Perez-Gimenez
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz on behalf of Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion de Puerto Rico, Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico (Ramirez-Ortiz, Juan)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: new counsel shall appear on behalf of defendant by December 19th. Attorney Appearance Deadline due by 12/19/2019Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 12/12/2019.(PMA)
December 10, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Melissa Massheder-Torres filed by Melissa Massheder-Torres on behalf of Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion de Puerto Rico, Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico Responses due by 12/26/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Massheder-Torres, Melissa)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for extension of time; granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear. Answer deadline due by 12/23/2019. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 12/4/2019. (PMA)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for extension of time until December 22, 2019 to Answer the Complaint or otherwise plead, MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Melissa Massheder-Torres on behalf of Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion de Puerto Rico, Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico Responses due by 12/6/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Massheder-Torres, Melissa)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pablo J. Figueroa-Vazquez upon Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion de Puerto Rico served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019; Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico served on 11/1/2019, answer due 11/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM 285) (gav)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion de Puerto Rico, Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico through the USMS, with copy of the order, complaint and USM-285. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 4(c)(3) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, service of summons upon Defendants shall be made by a United States Marshal. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 10/28/2019.(PMA)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 10/28/2019. (PMA)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion de Puerto Rico, Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico, filed by Pablo J. Figueroa-Vazquez, Pro Se. Service due by 1/13/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(ad)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 ***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Pablo J. Figueroa-Vazquez, Pro Se. (ad)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pablo J. Figueroa-Vazquez, Pro Se. Responses due by 10/29/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Figueroa-Vazquez v. Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Estado Libre Asociado de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Melissa Massheder-Torres
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Departamento de Correccion y Rehabilitacion de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Melissa Massheder-Torres
Represented By: Juan C. Ramirez-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pablo J. Figueroa-Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?