Municipio de Corozal v. Florida Power & Light
Plaintiff: Municipio de Corozal
Defendant: Florida Power & Light
Case Number: 3:2019cv01984
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Juan M Perez-Gimenez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Municipio de Corozal (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File; granting #10 Motion for extension of time. Certified translations due by 12/16/2019. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 11/20/2017. (PMA)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Document with Citations to Spanish Language References and to Submit Certified Translations, MOTION for extension of time filed by Lidiana Teresa Economou on behalf of Florida Power & Light Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Economou, Lidiana)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to dismiss as to Florida Power & Light filed by Florida Power & Light Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Translated State Court Documents)(Economou, Lidiana)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose J. Lamas-Rivera on behalf of Municipio de Corozal (Lamas-Rivera, Jose)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting as requested #2 Motion for extension of time. Compliance Deadline due by 11/15/2019. Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 10/28/2019. (PMA)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER RE COMMUNICATION WITH STAFF.Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 4/4/2014.(gav)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER RE COURTESY COPY.Signed by Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez on 4/4/2014.(gav)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement byFlorida Power & Light identifying Other Affiliate NextEra Energy Inc. for Florida Power & Light.. (Ramos-Pruetzel, Oreste)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Juan M. Perez-Gimenez (arg)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for extension of time filed by Oreste Ricardo Ramos-Pruetzel on behalf of Florida Power & Light Responses due by 10/30/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ramos-Pruetzel, Oreste)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Puerto Rico Court of First Instance, case number CZ2019CV00015. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6640616), filed by Florida Power & Light. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18)(Ramos-Pruetzel, Oreste)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Municipio de Corozal v. Florida Power & Light
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Power & Light
Represented By: Oreste Ricardo Ramos-Pruetzel
Represented By: Lidiana Teresa Economou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Municipio de Corozal
Represented By: Jose J. Lamas-Rivera
Represented By: Ricardo M. Prieto-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?