DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. v. Fuentes-Perez
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Defendant: Rosa Maria Fuentes Perez, Rosa Maria Fuentes-Perez and Rosa Fuentes-Perez
Case Number: 3:2019cv01986
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Noting #4 "Motion Presenting Affidavit Regarding Military Service." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/22/2019. (ebb)
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Monica Tabales-Maldonado on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. Responses due by 12/5/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Military Affidavit, #2 Exhibit SCRA Searches)(Tabales-Maldonado, Monica)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rosa Maria Fuentes Perez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rosa Maria Fuentes Perez ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6641657.), filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.. Service due by 1/15/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage Note, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #4 Summons Personal Summons)(Tabales-Maldonado, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc. v. Fuentes-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Maria Fuentes Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Maria Fuentes-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosa Fuentes-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DLJ Mortgage Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Monica Tabales-Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?