Estrada v. Cases et al
Plaintiff: Elvin Torres Estrada
Defendant: Gustavo Rivera, Jose Gonzalez, Aaron Green, Mario Renteria, The United States of America, Devin J. Kowalski, Carlos Cases, Luis Aloyo and Does 1-25
Case Number: 3:2019cv02013
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE to Counsel re #11 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. (ab)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00051. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred to District of Puerto Rico District Court. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Puerto Rico District Court*.*150 Carlos Chardon Avenue, Room 150**San Juan, PR 00918-1767*. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 10/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (jao) [Transferred from casd on 10/24/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or to Transfer Venue filed by The United States of America. (Cordero, Ernest) (jao). [Transferred from casd on 10/24/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or to Transfer Venue, #5 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or to Transfer Venue filed by Elvin Torres Estrada. (Crosby, James) (jao). [Transferred from casd on 10/24/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or to Transfer Venue, #5 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or to Transfer Venue filed by Elvin Torres Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Crosby, James) (jao). [Transferred from casd on 10/24/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James D Crosby on behalf of Elvin Torres Estrada (Crosby, James)Attorney James D Crosby added to party Elvin Torres Estrada(pty:pla) (jao). [Transferred from casd on 10/24/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Improper Venue and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or to Transfer Venue by The United States of America. (Cordero, Ernest) (jao). [Transferred from casd on 10/24/2019.]
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction or to Transfer Venue by The United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Theresa Talplacido, #3 Declaration of Beth Brown-Ghee, #4 Declaration of Gerald Auerbach, #5 Declaration of Jose Figueroa, #6 Declaration of Judith Priegues-Lopez)(Cordero, Ernest)Attorney Ernest Cordero, Jr added to party The United States of America(pty:dft) (jao). [Transferred from casd on 10/24/2019.]
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elvin Torres Estrada. Carlos Cases, The United States of America served. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service as to United States of America, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service as to Federal Bureau of Investigation, San Juan Field Office)(Crosby, James) (jao). [Transferred from casd on 10/24/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (jao). [Transferred from casd on 10/24/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Luis Aloyo, Carlos Cases, Does 1 through 25, Jose Gonzalez, Aaron Green, Devin J. Kowalski, Mario Renteria, Gustavo Rivera, The United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12070542.), filed by Elvin Torres Estrada. (Attachments: #1 civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-51-W-BGS. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Cortez, Ezekiel)(jrm) (jao). [Transferred from casd on 10/24/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estrada v. Cases et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gustavo Rivera
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Gonzalez
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Green
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Renteria
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Represented By: Ernest Cordero, Jr.
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin J. Kowalski
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Cases
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Aloyo
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elvin Torres Estrada
Represented By: James D Crosby
Represented By: Ezekiel E. Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?