Trafon Group, Inc. v. NS&J World Trading Corporation
Plaintiff: Trafon Group, Inc.
Defendant: NS&J World Trading Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv02026
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to NS&J World Trading Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons in a Civil Action) (rim)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Summons in Civil Action (Cruz-Rodriguez, Sheila)
October 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel A. Pietrantoni on behalf of Trafon Group, Inc. (Pietrantoni, Manuel)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez. (rim)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Compliance by Trafon Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Category Sheet, #2 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet) (Cruz-Rodriguez, Sheila)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING.Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). Notice of Compliance Deadline due by 10/31/2019. (arg)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT TraFon Group, Inc. against NS&J World Trading Corporation ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6661101.), filed by Trafon Group, Inc.. Service due by 1/27/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8)(Cruz-Rodriguez, Sheila)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trafon Group, Inc. v. NS&J World Trading Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trafon Group, Inc.
Represented By: Sheila M. Cruz-Rodriguez
Represented By: Manuel A. Pietrantoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NS&J World Trading Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?