Rodriguez-Burgos v. Safe Parking Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: William Rodriguez-Burgos
Defendant: Safe Parking Solutions, LLC, Centro Internacional de Mercadeo, S.E., Consejo de Titulares Condominio Centro Internacional de Mercadeo Torre I, Maritza Felix-Martinez and Caribbean City Parking LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02048
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 16, 2020 to File Answer or Dispositive Motion re: #8 Amended Complaint, filed by William Rodriguez-Burgos filed by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of Caribbean City Parking LLC, Safe Parking Solutions, LLC Responses due by 1/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of Caribbean City Parking LLC (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto Abesada-Aguet on behalf of Caribbean City Parking LLC (Abesada-Aguet, Roberto)
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Quash filed by Rafael G. Rivera-Rosario on behalf of Maritza Felix-Martinez Responses due by 1/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rivera-Rosario, Rafael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Consejo de Titulares Condominio Centro Internacional de Mercadeo Torre I, Caribbean City Parking LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm) Modified on 12/13/2019 correct party name (gav).
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT (as a matter of course) against Safe Parking Solutions, LLC, Consejo de Titulares Condominio Centro Internacional de Mercadeo Torre I, Caribbean City Parking LLC, filed by William Rodriguez-Burgos. (Attachments: #1 Summons (as to Caribbean City Parking LLC), #2 Summons (as to Consejo de Titulares Condominio Centro Internacional de Mercadeo Torre I))(Velez-Colon, Jose) Modified on 12/13/2019 edit text (gav).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Answer deadline due by 12/30/2019. Signed by Judge William G. Young on 12/2/2019. (EES)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until December 30, 2019 to File Answer or Dispositive Motion re: #1 Complaint, filed by William Rodriguez-Burgos filed by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of Safe Parking Solutions, LLC Responses due by 12/11/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sergio Criado-Mangual on behalf of Safe Parking Solutions, LLC (Criado-Mangual, Sergio)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Roberto Abesada-Aguet on behalf of Safe Parking Solutions, LLC (Abesada-Aguet, Roberto)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Centro Internacional de Mercadeo, S.E., Safe Parking Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (vdm)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against William Rodriguez-Burgos ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6673994.), filed by William Rodriguez-Burgos. Service due by 2/5/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Velez-Colon, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez-Burgos v. Safe Parking Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Rodriguez-Burgos
Represented By: Jose Carlos Velez-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safe Parking Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Sergio Criado-Mangual
Represented By: Roberto Abesada-Aguet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centro Internacional de Mercadeo, S.E.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Consejo de Titulares Condominio Centro Internacional de Mercadeo Torre I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maritza Felix-Martinez
Represented By: Rafael G. Rivera-Rosario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caribbean City Parking LLC
Represented By: Sergio Criado-Mangual
Represented By: Roberto Abesada-Aguet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?