QBE Seguros v. Perez-Santiago
Plaintiff: QBE Seguros
Defendant: HIlton Perez and Hilton Perez-Santiago
Case Number: 3:2019cv02050
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/26/2019. (brc)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal: GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/26/2019. (brc)
December 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by QBE Seguros (Quinones-Suarez, Pedro)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: GRANTED. Defendant Perez-Santiago will answer the complaint pro se or through counsel, no later than December 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 12/04/2019. (brc)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Hilton Perez-Santiago, Pro Se. Responses due by 12/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (ab)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by QBE Seguros upon Hilton Perez-Santiago served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Quinones-Suarez, Pedro)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hilton Perez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (vdm)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against HIlton Perez ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6674957.), filed by QBE Seguros. Service due by 2/5/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit QBE Yacht Policy, #2 Exhibit Examination Under Oath Request Letter, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Quinones-Suarez, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: QBE Seguros v. Perez-Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIlton Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Perez-Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QBE Seguros
Represented By: Pedro Quinones-Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?