Vega-Ortiz et al v. Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico et al
Plaintiff: Maribella Ramos Prieta, Gretchen Montalvo Espinosa, Joel Vega Ortiz, Ernie Rivera Diaz, Jamilh M Elias, Gretchen Montalvo-Espinosa, Maribella Ramos-Prieta, Ernie Rivera-Diaz and Joel Vega-Ortiz
Defendant: Ruth E Gomez Arias, John Doe(s), ABC Insurance Companies, Jane Doe(s), Luis J Vilaro Suarez, Luisana Rincon, Troncoso Consulting Group, Inc., Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico, Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Ruth E. Gomez-Arias and Luis J. Vilaro-Suarez
Case Number: 3:2019cv02056
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Granting in part and Denying in part #26 "Motion for Extension of Time Responsive Pleadings and for Plaintiffs to Oppose." The extension requested is not justified. Defendants, however, are granted until 1/10/2020 to answer the complaint or to otherwise plead. If a response by plaintiffs is needed, and more time is needed to respond, they shall move the court for an extension with the grounds in support of the request. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/26/2019. (LMR)
December 23, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen M. Alfonso-Rodriguez on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico (Alfonso-Rodriguez, Carmen)
December 23, 2019 Filing 26 Consent MOTION for extension of time until January 24, 2020 and February 14, 2020 to Defendants to file responsive pleadings and Plaintiffs to oppose responsive pleadings filed by Rebekka C. Veith on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Veith, Rebekka)
December 11, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement byBanco Popular de Puerto Rico identifying Corporate Parent Popular, Inc. for Banco Popular de Puerto Rico.. (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: Noting #15 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/10/2019. (ebb)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Granting #22 "Motion for Leave to Appear as Counsel of Record and for Enlargement of Time to Plead." Appearing party shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 01/06/2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/6/2019. (ebb)
December 6, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Carlos A. Steffens-Guzman on behalf of Troncoso Consulting Group, Inc. Responses due by 12/20/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Steffens-Guzman, Carlos)
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Granting #20 "Motion of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico for Extension of Time to Plead or Otherwise Defend." Appearing party shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by January 3, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/5/2019. (ebb)
December 4, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Defend re: #1 Complaint, filed by Maribella Ramos-Prieta, Gretchen Montalvo-Espinosa, Ernie Rivera-Diaz, Joel Vega-Ortiz, Jamilh M Elias filed by Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera on behalf of Banco Popular de Puerto Rico Responses due by 12/18/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Quinones-Rivera, Roberto)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Noting #18 "Notice of Appearance." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/25/2019. (ebb)
November 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Frances Y. Rivera-Aviles on behalf of Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico, Ruth E. Gomez-Arias, Luisana Rincon, Luis J. Vilaro-Suarez Responses due by 12/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rivera-Aviles, Frances)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Granting #16 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer." Answer the complaint or otherwise plead due by 12/24/2019. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/25/2019. (LMR)
November 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Leave to File Answer to Complaint and/or to Otherwise Plead re: #1 Complaint, filed by Maribella Ramos-Prieta, Gretchen Montalvo-Espinosa, Ernie Rivera-Diaz, Joel Vega-Ortiz, Jamilh M Elias filed by Edgar Hernandez-Sanchez on behalf of Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico, Ruth E. Gomez-Arias, Luisana Rincon, Luis J. Vilaro-Suarez Responses due by 12/9/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Hernandez-Sanchez, Edgar)
November 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Edgar Hernandez-Sanchez on behalf of Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico, Ruth E. Gomez-Arias, Luisana Rincon, Luis J. Vilaro-Suarez (Hernandez-Sanchez, Edgar)
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Troncoso Consulting Group, Inc. served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Luis J. Vilaro-Suarez served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Banco Popular de Puerto Rico served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Luisana Rincon served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Ruth E. Gomez-Arias served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Banco Popular de Puerto Rico, Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico, Ruth E Gomez Arias, Luisana Rincon, Troncoso Consulting Group, Inc., Luis J Vilaro Suarez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #4 "Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice." The Clerk shall deposit the admission fee to the account of non appropriated funds of this court. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/12/2019. (LMR)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting #3 "Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice." The Clerk shall deposit the admission fee to the account of non appropriated funds of this court. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/12/2019. (LMR)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to allow Rebekka Veith to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6677571) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to allow Jason Burge to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-6677569) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 11/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Civil Cover Sheet, Category Sheet, Summons (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons) (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6676648.), filed by Gretchen Montalvo Espinosa, Ernie Rivera Diaz, Jamilh M Elias, Joel Vega Ortiz, Maribella Ramos Prieta. Service due by 2/6/2020,(Vicente-Colon, Harold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vega-Ortiz et al v. Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth E Gomez Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe(s)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis J Vilaro Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luisana Rincon
Represented By: Frances Y. Rivera-Aviles
Represented By: Edgar Hernandez-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troncoso Consulting Group, Inc.
Represented By: Carlos A. Steffens-Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooperativa de Seguros Multiples de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Frances Y. Rivera-Aviles
Represented By: Edgar Hernandez-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Popular de Puerto Rico
Represented By: Roberto C. Quinones-Rivera
Represented By: Carmen M. Alfonso-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth E. Gomez-Arias
Represented By: Frances Y. Rivera-Aviles
Represented By: Edgar Hernandez-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis J. Vilaro-Suarez
Represented By: Frances Y. Rivera-Aviles
Represented By: Edgar Hernandez-Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribella Ramos Prieta
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen Montalvo Espinosa
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Vega Ortiz
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernie Rivera Diaz
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamilh M Elias
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gretchen Montalvo-Espinosa
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maribella Ramos-Prieta
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernie Rivera-Diaz
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Vega-Ortiz
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Jason W. Burge
Represented By: Rebekka C. Veith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?