C-Fuels, LLC v. Puma Energy Caribe LLC
Plaintiff: C-Fuels, LLC
Defendant: Puma Energy Caribe LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02057
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Referring Judge: Marshal D Morgan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 189 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER: Noted and Granted #185 Stipulation of voluntary dismissal with prejudice. The Court commends counsel for their diligent efforts in resolving this matter to the benefit of their respective clients. Judgment DISMISSING the present action with prejudice will be entered accordingly. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER: Granted #186 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 10/27/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 185 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**STIPULATION of Dismissal by Puma Energy Caribe LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER: Noted and holding in abeyance #178 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. The parties had informed the Court that they reached an agreement in principle to settle the pending litigation and are in the process of drafting the final settlement agreement. It appears, however, that issues have arisen. In light of the fact that the parties continue their discussions in hopes of consummating the settlement agreement, the Court hereby sets a Further Settlement Conference for 10/20/2022 at 9:00AM in VTC Bridge MDM before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER: Granted #181 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER: Granted #179 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 181 MOTION to Restrict Document Response at ECF No. 180 filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 10/13/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 180 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**RESPONSE to Motion filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC Re: #178 MOTION to reinstate C-Fuels' Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Opinion and Order dated December 13, 2021 re #94 MOTION for Reconsideration Brief motion for partial reconsideration re #87 Order on Motion to Compel fi filed by C-Fuels, LLC filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 179 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Heriberto Lopez-Guzman on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 10/11/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
September 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 178 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION to reinstate C-Fuels' Motion for Partial Reconsideration of the Opinion and Order dated December 13, 2021 re #94 MOTION for Reconsideration Brief motion for partial reconsideration re #87 Order on Motion to Compel filed by C-Fuels, LLC, #87 Order on Motion to Compel, 133 Order on Motion for Reconsideration,, filed by Heriberto Lopez-Guzman on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 10/11/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #94 , #87 , 133 ) (Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER: The parties informed the Court that they reached an agreement in principle to settle all matters pertaining to this case. Accordingly, the #61 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is hereby considered Moot. Should the settlement fall through, this motion can be re-filed. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER: Noted and Granted in part and Denied in part #173 Joint informative motion regarding settlement. At the outset, the Court commends counsel for their diligent efforts in resolving this matter to the benefit of their respective clients. As requested, the Court endorses the parties' "Letter of Intent," which sets forth their preliminary agreement to dispose of the present case in its entirety. Accordingly, the parties are GRANTED until September 19, 2022, to execute "Definite Agreements" to settle the case and to file the necessary dismissal documents. Puma shall share initial drafts of the "Definitive Agreements" with C-Fuels by September 7, 2022. The Court DENIES the parties' request to set aside the case management deadlines established at Docket No. 172 , all of which remain FIRM. Instead, the parties should comply with the self-imposed deadlines mentioned above, and when the required dismissal documents are filed, then all pending deadlines will automatically become moot. If the settlement possibilities sadly fall through, the case will move on in an expedited manner, as specified by the Court at Docket No. 172 . Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER: Granted #174 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Joint MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of all parties. Responses due by 9/14/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie) Modified on 9/1/2022 to add filer. (mg).
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 173 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** Joint INFORMATIVE Motion filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of all parties. Responses due by 9/14/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie) Modified on 9/1/2022 to add filer. (mg).
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER: The parties were ordered to inform the Court on or before August 10, 2022, that is, more than one week ago, whether they have reached a settlement in this case. As of today, the Court has heard nothing from either party. This is the second time the parties have failed to timely inform the Court of the status of settlement. The Court is therefore closing the door on settlement talks and understands that the parties will be proceeding to trial. As promised, the Court hereby sets the following case management deadlines: Deadline to conclude discovery (including expert witnesses and reports) - November 14, 2022. Deadline to file motions for summary judgment - December 14, 2022. Deadline to respond to any motion for summary judgment - January 27, 2023. Deadline to file any replies thereto - February 3, 2023. Deadline to file Joint Proposed Pretrial Order - February 10, 2023. The Pre-Trial Conference will be held on February 17, 2023, and a Jury Trial will be held on February 27, 2023. These deadlines are FIRM. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER: Granted #170 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez terminated. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 8/29/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER: Noted and Granted #166 Motion In Compliance. The parties shall inform by August 10, 2022 whether they reached an amicable resolution of this case. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER: Granted #167 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 8/17/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 166 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** Joint Motion In Compliance filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of all parties. Responses due by 8/17/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie) Modified on 8/4/2022 to add filer. (mg).
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER: The parties had requested until Wednesday, June 29, 2022, to report back to the Court and inform whether they had reached an agreement to settle this case. The parties, however, failed to do so and are therefore ORDERED to inform the Court by COB August 3, 2022, if they indeed reached an amicable resolution of this case. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER: Granted #162 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER: Granted #161 Motion for extension of time. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 7/8/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 161 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION for extension of time filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 7/8/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER: Noted #158 Informative Motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER: Granted #157 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 158 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**Joint Motion In Compliance with Minute Order filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of all parties. Responses due by 7/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian) Modified on 6/21/2022 to add filer (mg).
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION to Restrict Document Joint Informative Motion in Compliance filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 7/1/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan: Sixth Settlement Conference held on 6/1/2022. See attached document. If the parties are able to reach an agreement, the Court ordered them to file an appropriate motion with the Court. If by Friday, June 17, 2022, however, the parties have still not reached an agreement, they are ORDERED to file an informative motion with the Court explaining what if anything else needs to be done to reach a settlement. Conversely, if no settlement can be reached, the parties shall also so inform the Court so that it can then lift the stay, resolve any issues over a protective order and revise the discovery timetable. (cml)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER: Granted #153 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER. Due to the undersigned's unavailability, the Further Settlement Conference set for 6/1/2022 will now be held at 1:30 PM in VTC Bridge MDM before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan on 5/31/2022.(cml)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 6/10/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ***CASE PARTICIPANTS*** RESPONSE to Motion Puma respectfully responds to C-Fuels, LLCs Motion to Lift the Stay of Discovery. filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC Re: #150 MOTION to lift stay (should the parties fail to reach an agreement by June 1st, 2022) re 145 Order on Motion to Stay,, filed by C-Fuels, LLC filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC. (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie) Modified on 5/31/2022 to place restrictions. (mg).
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER: Noted #150 Informative motion regarding request for lift of stay. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MOTION to lift stay (should the parties fail to reach an agreement by June 1st, 2022) re 145 Order on Motion to Stay,, filed by Heriberto Lopez-Guzman on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 6/8/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 145 ) (Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan: Fifth Settlement Conference held on 5/4/2022. See attached document. A Further Settlement Conference is scheduled for Wednesday, June 1, 2022, at 9:00 AM in the virtual chambers of U.S. Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. The parties are reminded to have their respective principals present at the conference or have them available by phone or by videoconference. (cml)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan:Settlement Conference held on 4/27/2022. See attached document. A Further Settlement Conference is set for 5/4/2022 at 1:30 PM in VTC Bridge MDM before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (cml)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER. Due to the undersigned's unavailability, the Further Settlement Conference set for 4/19/2022 is RESET for 4/27/2022 at 1:30 PM in VTC Bridge MDM before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan on 4/6/2022.(cml)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER: Further Settlement Conference is hereby set for 4/19/2022 at 9:00 AM in VTC Bridge MDM before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 145 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** ORDER: Granted #135 Motion to Stay Discovery. The Court believes that a brief stay of the pending discovery addressed in the Court's December 13, 2021, Opinion and Order is justified in this case in light of the fact that the parties are currently engaging in meaningful and good faith discussions to reach an amicable settlement of the pending suit, with the Court's assistance. If the settlement possibilities sadly fall short, as previously specified by the Court, it will set a strict discovery and dispositive motion timetable, with a final pretrial conference and trial to be scheduled prior to the end of this year. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER: Noted #140 Motion In Compliance. The Court will promptly schedule a Settlement Conference. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER: Granted #139 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER: Granted #138 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER: Granted #136 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 140 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**Joint Motion In Compliance as to 132 Order on Motion In Compliance, filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of all parties. Responses due by 4/12/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 132 ) (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian) Modified on 3/30/2022 to add filer (mg).
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MOTION to Restrict Document Joint Informative Motion in Compliance with Court Order at ECF No. 132 filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 4/12/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Heriberto Lopez-Guzman on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 4/11/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 137 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**RESPONSE in Opposition filed by C-Fuels, LLC Re: #135 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC filed by C-Fuels, LLC. (Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION to Restrict Document Motion for Brief Stay Discovery (ECF No. 135) filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 4/6/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 135 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 4/6/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Motions terminated: #94 Brief Partial Motion for Reconsideration Re: #87 Order on Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC (Vilella-Alonso, Stephanie)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER: The Court is reassured by the parties' fruitful conversations aimed towards reaching an amicable resolution of the litigation at hand. As such, and so that the pending discovery #94 Motion for partial reconsideration does not linger out there, it is hereby held in abeyance until further notice. If settlement negotiations regrettably fall through, the parties can revisit the discovery issue at a later date. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 132 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**ORDER: Noted #130 Motion In Compliance. The parties shall Jointly inform the Court by 3/29/2022 of the results of the appraisals. The Court will schedule a further Settlement Conference shortly thereafter. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER: Granted #129 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 130 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**Joint Motion In Compliance as to 128 Order,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 3/3/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 128 ) (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MOTION to Restrict Document Joint Informative Motion in Compliance with Court Order at ECF No. 128 filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 3/3/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 128 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** ORDER: During the most recent settlement conference, and with the full agreement of both parties, the Court ORDERED the parties to obtain a list of bank-approved appraisers who could conduct appraisals of the five Puma stations at issue in this case. The parties complied and now have a list of bank-approved appraisers who can conduct the appraisals of the five service stations. At this time, however, the parties are seeking the Court's intervention once more because Puma recently suggested that two (2) appraisals, instead of one, be conducted, claiming that this would provide more confidence in the final valuation and would better serve the prospect of reaching a final settlement. After thorough consideration of the parties' positions, the Court is persuaded that having two (2) appraisals, as opposed to just one, can indeed prove to be a helpful tool to assist the parties in their negotiation and settlement efforts. As such, the parties are ORDERED to meet and confer in good faith by February 16, 2022, in order to select two (2) bank-approved appraisers from the list obtained by C-Fuels. The parties are also ORDERED to inform the Court by February 17, 2022, of the two (2) bank-approved appraisers selected and the timetable for the appraisals to be conducted. In the unfortunate event that the parties are unable to agree on the two (2) appraisers, they shall submit as part of the above-mentioned motion the list of the bank-approved appraisers, with their qualifications, for the Court to select which two (2) appraisers shall be used. Because Puma is the only party in favor of having two (2) appraisals conducted, in the interest of fairness, Puma shall pay for the full cost of one of the appraisals. With respect to the other appraisal, as originally agreed during the last settlement conference, C-Fuels and Puma will shoulder the expense equally. Understanding that these commercial appraisals require a certain expertise and can be very costly, Puma is free to decide not to conduct the second appraisal and shall inform the Court of its choice by February 17, 2022. The parties are encouraged to take advantage of the Court's assistance in this matter with an eye towards continuing to do business together, while at the same time resolving the present dispute in a mutually beneficial manner. On a final note, if the Court detects that settlement discussions are falling off the rails, the Court will not hesitate to impose a strict discovery timetable, even tighter dispositive motion timetable, with a final pretrial conference to be scheduled prior to the end of this year. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER: Noted #123 Informative motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER: Noted #110 Supplemental Motion. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER: Noted #105 Motion In Compliance. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER: Granted #121 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 123 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Minute Entry at ECF No. 116 filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 2/17/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 122 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**RESPONSE to Motion for Partial Reconsideration filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC Re: #94 MOTION for Reconsideration Brief motion for partial reconsideration re #87 Order on Motion to Compel filed by C-Fuels, LLC filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION to Restrict Document PUMA's Response to C-Fuels Motion for Partial Reconsideration and Informative Motion re: Minute Entry at ECF No. 116 filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 2/17/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 120 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** NOTICE of errata by C-Fuels, LLC re #119 Reply to Response to Motion, (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 119 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**REPLY to Response to Motion Brief reply to Puma's response at ECF no. 111 filed by C-Fuels, LLC Re: #105 Motion In Compliance (to inform of recent developments and to request the Court's intervention and assistance) filed by C-Fuels, LLC filed by C-Fuels, LLC. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER: Granted #115 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER: Granted #114 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 115 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION for Leave to File Document Brief reply filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 2/16/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Brief reply to Puma's Response at ECF No. 111)(Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MOTION to Restrict Document Motion for leave to file a brief reply filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 2/16/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER: Granted #109 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER: Granted #108 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 111 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**RESPONSE to Motion at ECF No. 105 filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC Re: #105 Motion In Compliance (to inform of recent developments and to request the Court's intervention and assistance) filed by C-Fuels, LLC, #108 MOTION to Restrict Document (Response to Plaintiff's Motion at ECF No. 105) filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC. (Estrella, Alberto)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 110 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** Supplemental Motion to supplement motion in compliance with court order re: #105 Motion In Compliance (to inform of recent developments and to request the Court's intervention and assistance) filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 2/16/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Avaluo Advisors, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - JJ Jimenez & Ass, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - JD Appraisal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - ODV Appraisal Group)(Related document(s) #105 ) (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION to Restrict Document Motion to supplement motion in compliance with court order filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 2/16/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION to Restrict Document (Response to Plaintiff's Motion at ECF No. 105) filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 2/15/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER: Granted #104 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 NOTICE by Puma Energy Caribe LLC re #105 Motion In Compliance (to inform of recent developments and to request the Court's intervention and assistance) (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 105 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** Motion In Compliance (to inform of recent developments and to request the Court's intervention and assistance) filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 2/11/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 2/11/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER: Granted #102 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz terminated from the present case. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz filed by Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 2/4/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Ortiz, Gerardo)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan: Settlement Conference held on 1/18/2022. See attached document. Further Settlement Conference is hereby set for 1/21/2022 at 1:30 PM in VTC Bridge MDM before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (cml)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER: Granted #99 Motion for Extension of Time until 1/24/2022 to file Response/Reply to Motion for Reconsideration. Response/Reply due by 1/24/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/24/2022 to File Response/Reply as to #94 MOTION for Reconsideration Brief motion for partial reconsideration re #87 Order on Motion to Compel filed by C-Fuels, LLC filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 1/18/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #94 ) (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER: Granted #93 Motion to Restrict. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER: Noted and Denied as Moot #90 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. As the defendant points out, the Local Rules do not provide for a party to file another memorandum after a sur-reply is filed and the Court will not abandon that rule. Furthermore, it is well-known that a litigant may not utilize a sur-reply to raise new arguments it could and should have presented in an earlier memorandum. Southwire Co. v. Ramallo Bros. Printing, Inc., 540 F. Supp. 2d 307, 311 n.5 (D.P.R. 2008). As such, the Court will not allow another filing akin to a sur-sur-reply and will certainly not consider issues raised for the first time in a reply brief. Having addressed the defendant's concerns, its request for miscellaneous relief is denied. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 NOTICE of errata by C-Fuels, LLC re #95 SURReply to Reply to Opposition, (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition filed by C-Fuels, LLC Re: #85 MOTION for Leave to File Document Motion for leave to file a surreplyConsent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 15, 2021 to file Surreply to Puma's ReplyConsented motion for a 7-day extension of time filed by C-Fuels, LLC, #61 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC filed by C-Fuels, LLC. (Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** MOTION for Reconsideration Brief motion for partial reconsideration re #87 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 1/4/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Fuel Daily Purchase Agreement)(Related document(s) #87 ) (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION to Restrict Document Motion to restrict brief motion for partial reconsideration and its exhibit 1 filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 1/4/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER: Noted #91 Motion In Compliance. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 Motion In Compliance as to #87 Order on Motion to Compel filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 1/3/2022. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #87 ) (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 12/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Ortiz, Gerardo)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: Granted #88 Final Motion for Extension of Time to File. Sur-reply due by December 22, 2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Final MOTION for Extension of Time until December 22, 2021 to file Surreply filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 12/28/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 OPINION AND ORDER: Granted in part and Denied in part #47 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: Granted #85 Motion for Leave to File; Motion for Extension of Time. Sur-reply due by December 15th, 2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MOTION for Leave to File Document Motion for leave to file a surreply, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 15, 2021 to file Surreply to Puma's ReplyConsented motion for a 7-day extension of time filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 12/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Motion to Continue. Settlement Conference set for 1/10/2022 is RESET for 1/18/2022 at 9:00 AM in VTC Bridge MDM before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan on 12/6/2021. (cml)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MOTION to Continue Motion to continue settlement conference scheduled for January 10, 2022 filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 12/20/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC Re: #61 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translations)(Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER. Further Settlement Conference is set for 1/10/2022 at 9:00 AM in VTC Bridge MDM before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan on 11/29/2021. (cml)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER: Granted #77 Motion to Continue Settlement Conference. The Court will be issuing a ruling briefly on the plaintiff's outstanding motion to compel. That decision will give the parties reasonable guidance moving forward and put them in a better position to discuss settlement. The new date for the settlement conference will be issued by separate order. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: Granted #76 Motion for Leave to File Response/Reply to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Granted #76 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The parties shall strictly observe the rules regarding page limits. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.) Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by C-Fuels, LLC Re: #77 MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference set for November 29, 2021 filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC filed by C-Fuels, LLC. (Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION to Continue Settlement Conference set for November 29, 2021 filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 12/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/1/2021 to File Response/Reply as to #75 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by C-Fuels, LLC filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 12/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #75 ) (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion filed by C-Fuels, LLC Re: #61 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC filed by C-Fuels, LLC. (Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AMENDED ORDER as to #70 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Counsel Gerardo J. Cruz is granted permission to substitute Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez as counsel for the defendant. Counsel Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez is hereby terminated from the present case. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER: Granted #70 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz is hereby terminated from the present case. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: Granted #69 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #61 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c). Response/Reply due by 11/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MOTION to Substitute Counsel Attorney Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz filed by Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 11/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cruz-Ortiz, Gerardo)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan: Settlement Conference held on 11/8/2021. See attached document. A Further Settlement Conference is set for 11/29/2021 at 9:00 AM in VTC Bridge MDM before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (cml)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 17, 2021 to File Response/Reply Consented Second Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Response to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 11/22/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: Granted #67 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Reply due by 11/10/2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 10, 2021 to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings at Docket No. 61 filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 11/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exh. A- Order case 20-1655, #2 Exh. B- Order case 19-cv-1307)(Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 SURREPLY to Reply to Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC Re: #47 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by C-Fuels, LLC filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Translation of previous Franchise Agreement between the parties.)(Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER: Granted #64 Motion for extension of time. FINAL extension. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 Final MOTION for extension of time until 10/22/2021 to file sur-reply to Motion to Compel Discovery at ECF No. 47 filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 11/3/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: Granted #62 Motion for Leave to File; Granted #62 Motion for extension of time. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to File Document Surreply to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel at ECF No. 47, MOTION for extension of time until 10/20/2021 to file Surreply filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 11/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 11/2/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER. Due to the undersigned's unavailability, the Settlement Conference set for 11/12/2021 is ADVANCED to 11/8/2021 at 9:00 AM in VTC Bridge MDM before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan on 10/14/2021. (cml)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by C-Fuels, LLC Re: #47 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by C-Fuels, LLC filed by C-Fuels, LLC. (Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER: Granted #57 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Leave to File Document (reply brief in further support of C-Fuels' motion to compel) filed by Heriberto Lopez-Guzman on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 10/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Tendered Reply Brief)(Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Granted #55 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re: ECF No. 54 filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 10/19/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery filed by All Defendants Re: #47 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by C-Fuels, LLC filed by All Defendants. (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: Granted #52 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/4/2021 to File Response/Reply as to 49 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 10/8/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) 49 ) (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: Granted #50 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #47 Motion to Compel Discovery. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/21/2021 to File Response/Reply as to #47 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by C-Fuels, LLC filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of All Defendants Responses due by 9/30/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #47 ) (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: Granted #48 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (GDM)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 9/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Heriberto Lopez-Guzman on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 9/17/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting as requested #45 Motion to Amend/Correct. All discovery deadlines shall be extended by 60 days. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan on 7/12/2021. (cml)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order (JOINT) Re: #44 Minute,, Status Conference,, Set Hearings, filed by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 7/23/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #44 ) (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan: Status Conference held on 4/21/2021. See attached document. Settlement Conference is set for 11/12/2021 at 9:00 AM in VTC Bridge MDM before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan. (cml)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose R. Davila-Acevedo on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC (Davila-Acevedo, Jose)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. Status Conference is hereby set for 4/21/2021 at 9:00 AM in VTC Bridge MDM before US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan.Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan on 3/23/2021.(cml)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (Docket No. 40), this case has been randomly assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Marshal D. Morgan to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c). All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 19-2057 (MDM). Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 03/10/2021. (ft)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER re #39 Case Management Memorandum. In view of the parties' consent to the trial jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge (ECF 39, p. 11), this case is referred to a United States Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/10/2021.(wm)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT MEMORANDUM Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan by C-Fuels, LLC. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER re #35 Motion for Attorney Fees. Puma's motion for attorneys' fees is DENIED. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/25/2021. (wm)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Heriberto Lopez-Guzman on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC (Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Plaintiff's Opposition to "Puma Caribe Energy LLC'S Motion for Attorneys Fees in Light of Partial Judgment" filed by C-Fuels, LLC Re: #35 MOTION for Attorney Fees in Light of Partial Judgment filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC filed by C-Fuels, LLC. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Attorney Fees in Light of Partial Judgment filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 12/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-1 (Original Mutual Termination Agreement), #2 Exhibit Exhibit A-2 (Certified Translation of Mutual Termination Agreement), #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Detail and Certification of Fees)(Estrella, Alberto)
November 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**PARTIAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk on 11/27/2020.(sr)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 **CASE PARTICIPANTS**OPINION AND ORDER re #14 MOTION to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and (b)(6) as to Puma Energy Caribe LLC, C-Fuels, LLC. GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/24/2020.(wm) Modified filing date on 11/30/2020 (idg).
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition to #21 Response and in Support of Puma's #14 Motion to Dismiss filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC. (Estrella, Alberto) Modified relationship and docket text on 4/30/2020 (idg).
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #30 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 29, 2020 to File Response/Reply. Granted. Defendant's reply due by 4/29/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 4/15/2020. (wm)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 29, 2020 to File Response/Reply filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 4/23/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER re #22 Motion In Compliance. Noted. The Complaint will remain sealed. Any additional filings shall comply with the Consent Order issued in 15-2574 (GAG), ECF No. 61. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/16/2020. (wm)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File; granting #23 Motion for extension of time. Reply due by 3/24/2020. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/10/2020. (wm)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER re #24 Motion In Compliance. Noted. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/10/2020. (wm)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Restrict. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 3/10/2020. (wm)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION to Restrict Document Plaintiff's Informative Motion In Compliance and its Exhibits at Docket No. 24 filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 3/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** Motion In Compliance "Plaintiff's Informative Motion In Compliance with Honorable Judge Delgado-Colon's Order at Docket No. 17" as to 17 Order on Motion to Restrict,, filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 3/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Motion Requesting Approval and Issuance of Consent Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Consent Order of February 21, 2020)(Related document(s) 17 ) (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Document Reply Memorandum and for extension of time until March 24, 2020 to file Reply Memorandum filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 3/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco). Added MOTION for extension of time on 3/5/2020 (idg).
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #22 Motion In Compliance as to 17 Order on Motion to Restrict. *** Counsel Alberto Estrella is notified of the requirement to file a Motion to Restrict in compliance with Standing Order No. 9 filed in Misc. 03-149(ADC). Motion to Restrict to be filed.*** (idg)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 **CASE PARTICIPANTS** Motion In Compliance as to 17 Order on Motion to Restrict,, filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 3/17/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Order in Case No. 15-cv-02574)(Related document(s) 17 ) (Estrella, Alberto)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Plaintiff's Response in Oposition to Defendant Puma Energy Caribe, LLC's Motion to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(1) & 12(b)(2) filed by C-Fuels, LLC Re: #14 MOTION to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and (b)(6) as to Puma Energy Caribe LLC, C-Fuels, LLC filed by C-Fuels, LLC. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #18 Motion for extension of time. Granted as requested. Opposition due 2/28/2020. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/27/2020. (wm)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for extension of time until January 28, 2020 to Plaintiff has been working on different motion in other cases, and is currently preparing for trial that starts next Wenesday. Counsel for defense has graciously agreed to this request. filed by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 3/9/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Restrict Defendant's request for restricted filing is GRANTED. Defendant request to seal the complaint is GRANTED. The parties shall file informative motions restricted to the parties setting forth their respective arguments as to the issue raised by defendant at ECF No. 11, namely, the purported inclusion of references to the parties' confidential stipulation at Civil 15-2574 (GAG), ECF No. 44. Compliance due within 20 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/21/2020. (wm)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for extension of time. Response to Motion Deadline due by 2/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/19/2020. (wm)
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for extension of time until February 24, 2020 filed by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of C-Fuels, LLC Responses due by 2/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ***SELECTED PARTIES***MOTION to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and (b)(6) as to Puma Energy Caribe LLC, C-Fuels, LLC filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 2/14/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Insurance Policy as to Service Station 007, #2 Exhibit Insurance Policy as to Service Station 023, #3 Exhibit Insurance Policy as to Service Station 043, #4 Exhibit Insurance Policy as to Service Station 073, #5 Exhibit Insurance Policy as to Service Station 139)(Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Defendant Puma Energy Caribe LLC.(Estrella, Alberto)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement byPuma Energy Caribe LLC. (Estrella, Alberto)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Restrict Document filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 2/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 1/31/2020. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/16/2020. (wm)
January 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Second MOTION for Extension of Time until January 31, 2020 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by C-Fuels, LLC filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 1/27/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Estrella, Alberto)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 1/13/2020. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 11/21/2019. (wm)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by C-Fuels, LLC filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 12/2/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Estrella, Alberto)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Puma Energy Caribe LLC served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019. (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Puma Energy Caribe LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
November 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Harold D. Vicente-Colon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vicente-Colon, Harold)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Summons Summon) (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Puma Energy Caribe LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6677122.), filed by C-Fuels, LLC. Service due by 2/6/2020,(Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C-Fuels, LLC v. Puma Energy Caribe LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C-Fuels, LLC
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Colon
Represented By: Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puma Energy Caribe LLC
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Represented By: Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez
Represented By: Jose R. Davila-Acevedo
Represented By: Gerardo J. Cruz-Ortiz
Represented By: Stephanie Michelle Vilella-Alonso
Represented By: Gerardo Jose Cruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?