Cadillac Uniform and Linen Supply LLC v. Central General de Trabajadores
Plaintiff: Cadillac Uniform and Linen Supply LLC
Defendant: Central General de Trabajadores
Case Number: 3:2019cv02060
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER noted #10 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/17/2019. (wm)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Service of Process filed by Ada Nurie Pagan-Isona on behalf of Cadillac Uniform and Linen Supply LLC Responses due by 12/27/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Pagan-Isona, Ada)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #8 Motion for TRO. Plaintiff's filing at ECF No. 8 is GRANTED. Defendant is hereby enjoined from requesting or compelling plaintiff to attend the arbitration hearing scheduled for December 9, 2019. An Opinion and Order will follow. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 12/4/2019. (sr)
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunction filed by Ada Nurie Pagan-Isona on behalf of Cadillac Uniform and Linen Supply LLC Responses due by 12/10/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pagan-Isona, Ada)
November 12, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Daniel R. Domingez (Docket No. 6), this case has been transferred to the docket of Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon, who has consented to said transfer, as it is related to Civil Case Number 19-cv-1744-ADC. Signed by Clerk on 11/12/2019. (gr)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. As the Court deems that the instant matter is related to the Settlement Agreement entered in civil case no. 19-1744 (ADC), and in the best interest of justice, the undersigned hereby transfers the instant case to the docket of U.S. District Judge Aida Delgado Colon for full disposition. See L.Cv.R. 3(d)(2). Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 11/12/2019. (EA)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Central General de Trabajadores (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Carlos Concepcion-Castro on behalf of Cadillac Uniform and Linen Supply LLC (Concepcion-Castro, Carlos)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION Submitting Memorandum of Law in Support of TRO, Injunction and Declaratory Judgment filed by Ada Nurie Pagan-Isona on behalf of Cadillac Uniform and Linen Supply LLC Responses due by 11/25/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pagan-Isona, Ada)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Declaratory Judgment against Central General de Trabajadores ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6677599.), filed by Cadillac Uniform and Linen Supply LLC. Service due by 2/10/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Pagan-Isona, Ada)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cadillac Uniform and Linen Supply LLC v. Central General de Trabajadores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cadillac Uniform and Linen Supply LLC
Represented By: Ada Nurie Pagan-Isona
Represented By: Carlos Concepcion-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central General de Trabajadores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?