United States of America v. Sabana Grande Municipality
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Sabana Grande Municipality
Case Number: 3:2019cv02090
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 CONSENT JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/10/2020.(LMR)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting #3 "Motion to Approve Consent Judgment." Having reviewed the Settlement Agreement entered into by the parties, and the complaint filed in this case, the request for judgment against the Municipality of Sabana Grande in the principal amount of $500,000.00, plus interest at the prevalent legal rate from the date of judgment, in addition to costs and attorney's fees or the 10% surcharge imposed by law if plaintiff is forced to use the remedies provided under subchapters B or C of the Federal Debt Collection Procedures Act of 1990, 28 USC Sec. 3011, in the event defendant defaults as provided in the Settlement Agreement, is APPROVED. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/10/2020. (LMR)
January 3, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by Jorge L. Matos on behalf of United States of America Responses due by 1/17/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Judgment)(Matos, Jorge)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (vdm)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Consent Judgment against Sabana Grande Municipality, filed by United States of America. Service due by 2/20/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit A: Settlement Agreement)(Matos, Jorge)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Sabana Grande Municipality
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabana Grande Municipality
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jorge L. Matos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?