Ortiz Castro et al v. Hospital SAn Lucas de Ponce Inc. d/b/a Hospital San Lucas de Ponce et al
Plaintiff: D.Q.O., Ivan Armando Quionez-Plaza and Pamela Ortiz Castro
Defendant: Matt Doe, Dr. Keila Pratts-Rodriguez, conjugal partnership doe pratts, Company A, John Doe, Bob Doe, Corpopration B-Z, Hospital SAn Lucas de Ponce Inc. d/b/a Hospital San Lucas de Ponce, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Ortiz, Fred Doe, Insurance Company A-Z, Jim Doe, Dr. Annabelle Ortiz Rivera, Dr. Maryrose Concepcion Giron and Conjugal Partneship Doe - Concepcion
Case Number: 3:2019cv02104
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for extension of time. Codefendant Dr. Annabelle Ortiz Rivera is to answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 2/13/2020. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/15/2020. (EA)
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for extension of time until 2/13/2020 filed by Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez on behalf of Dr. Annabelle Ortiz Rivera Responses due by 1/27/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Dieppa-Gonzalez, Ramonita)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Codefendant Hospital Episcopal San Lucas Inc. is to answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 2/10/2020. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/10/2020. (EA)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 9, 2020 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by D.Q.O. filed by Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz on behalf of Hospital SAn Lucas de Ponce Inc. d/b/a Hospital San Lucas de Ponce Responses due by 1/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Rodriguez-Munoz, Luis)
January 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez on behalf of Hospital SAn Lucas de Ponce Inc. d/b/a Hospital San Lucas de Ponce (Vera-Ramirez, Eduardo)
January 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil on behalf of Dr. Keila Pratts-Rodriguez (Gonzalez-Villamil, Jose)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Codefendant Dr. Keyla Pratts Rodriguez is to answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 2/10/2020. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/10/2020. (EA)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Tania Delgado-Diaz on behalf of Defendant Dr. Keila Pratts-Rodriguez.(Delgado-Diaz, Tania)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER RE CODE OF CIVILITY. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 8/7/2017.(gav)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Dr. Maryrose Concepcion Giron served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020; Dr. Annabelle Ortiz Rivera served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020; Dr. Keila Pratts-Rodriguez served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020; conjugal partnership doe pratts served on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Hospital SAn Lucas de Ponce Inc. d/b/a Hospital San Lucas de Ponce served on 12/19/2019, answer due 1/9/2020. (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Martinez-Mendez, Alejandra)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dr. Maryrose Concepcion Giron, Conjugal Partnership Doe-Ortiz, Conjugal Partneship Doe - Concepcion, Fred Doe, John Doe, Jim Doe, Hospital San Lucas de Ponce Inc. d/b/a Hospital San Lucas de Ponce, Dr. Annabelle Ortiz Rivera, Dr. Keila Pratts-Rodriguez, Conjugal Partnership Doe Pratts (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6702100.), filed by D.Q.O.. Service due by 3/3/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons)(Fernandez-Muzaurieta, Alejandro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz Castro et al v. Hospital SAn Lucas de Ponce Inc. d/b/a Hospital San Lucas de Ponce et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Keila Pratts-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jose A. Gonzalez-Villamil
Represented By: Tania Delgado-Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: conjugal partnership doe pratts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Company A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corpopration B-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hospital SAn Lucas de Ponce Inc. d/b/a Hospital San Lucas de Ponce
Represented By: Eduardo A. Vera-Ramirez
Represented By: Luis A. Rodriguez-Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partnership Doe-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company A-Z
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Annabelle Ortiz Rivera
Represented By: Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Maryrose Concepcion Giron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conjugal Partneship Doe - Concepcion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.Q.O.
Represented By: Alejandro J. Fernandez-Muzaurieta
Represented By: Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivan Armando Quionez-Plaza
Represented By: Alejandro J. Fernandez-Muzaurieta
Represented By: Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Ortiz Castro
Represented By: Alejandro J. Fernandez-Muzaurieta
Represented By: Alejandra C. Martinez-Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?