Berrios-Correa v. MAPFRE
Plaintiff: Raquel Berrios, MAPFRE and Raquel Berrios-Correa
Case Number: 3:2019cv02105
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear AND REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO PLEAD filed by Nuyen Marrero-Bonilla on behalf of MAPFRE Responses due by 2/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Marrero-Bonilla, Nuyen)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to MAPFRE (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAPFRE ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6702093.), filed by Raquel Berrios. Service due by 3/3/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet CATEGORY SHEET, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #3 Summons SUMMONS)(Vazquez, III, Pedro)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berrios-Correa v. MAPFRE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Berrios
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAPFRE
Represented By: Nuyen Marrero-Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raquel Berrios-Correa
Represented By: Pedro R. Vazquez, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?