Santos-Santos v. Asociacion Clinica Las Americas D/B/A Clinica Las Americas and/or Centro de Cirugia Ambulatoria Las Americas CCALA Corp et al
Plaintiff: Jose L. Santos-Santos
Defendant: John Doe, Jane Roe, Insurance Company A B C, MAINTENANCE COMPANY X, ASOCIACION CLINICA LAS AMERICAS D/B/A CLINICA LAS AMERICAS and/or CENTRO DE CIRUGIA AMBULATORIA LAS AMERICAS CCALA CORP, CORPORATION XYZ and CHRISTIANSEN INSURANCE GROUP INC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02116
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Jay A Garcia-Gregory
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/23/2020. (lir)
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance, MOTION Requesting Extension of Time to Plead by Roberto L. Prats-Palerm on behalf of Asociacion Clinica Las Americas D/B/A Clinica Las Americas and/or Centro de Cirugia Ambulatoria Las Americas CCALA Corp (Prats-Palerm, Roberto) Modified on 1/16/2020 to correct event (gmm).
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Asociacion Clinica Las Americas D/B/A Clinica Las Americas and/or Centro de Cirugia Ambulatoria Las Americas CCALA Corp., Christiansen Insurance Group INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) Modified on 12/9/2019 to replace all caps text. (mg).
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 Case transferred in from District of Puerto Rico; Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received., COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6707783.) ( Service due by 3/4/2020,), filed by Jose L. Santos-Santos. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Cobian-Roig, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santos-Santos v. Asociacion Clinica Las Americas D/B/A Clinica Las Americas and/or Centro de Cirugia Ambulatoria Las Americas CCALA Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company A B C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAINTENANCE COMPANY X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASOCIACION CLINICA LAS AMERICAS D/B/A CLINICA LAS AMERICAS and/or CENTRO DE CIRUGIA AMBULATORIA LAS AMERICAS CCALA CORP
Represented By: Roberto L. Prats-Palerm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORPORATION XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTIANSEN INSURANCE GROUP INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose L. Santos-Santos
Represented By: Manuel Cobian-Roig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?