Sistema Universitario Ana G. Mendez, Incorporado v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Sistema Universitario Ana G. Mendez, Incorporado
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2019cv02118
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Daniel R Dominguez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to allow Pieter Van Tol to Appear PHV. Signed by Judge Daniel R. Dominguez on 1/24/2020. (CBM)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 Motion to allow Pieter Van Tol to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number PRX100069327) filed by Eric A. Tulla on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association Responses due by 2/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Fee Receipt)(Tulla, Eric)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sistema Universitario Ana G. Mendez, Incorporado. U.S. Bank National Association waiver sent on 12/9/2019, answer due 2/7/2020. (Cumpiano, Lady)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U.S. Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lady E. Cumpiano on behalf of Sistema Universitario Ana G. Mendez, Incorporado (Cumpiano, Lady)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6710692.), filed by Sistema Universitario Ana G. Mendez, Incorporado. Service due by 3/5/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Sepulvado-Ramos, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sistema Universitario Ana G. Mendez, Incorporado v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Pieter Van Tol
Represented By: Eric A. Tulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sistema Universitario Ana G. Mendez, Incorporado
Represented By: Lee Sepulvado-Ramos
Represented By: Lady E. Cumpiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?