Ariza-Arias v. Saint John's School et al
Plaintiff: Martha Ariza-Arias
Defendant: Saint John's School, Joint Tortfeasors DEF and ABC Insurance Companies
Case Number: 3:2019cv02143
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer deadline due by 3/19/2020. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 2/7/2020. (wm)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Marie Rodriguez-Ugarte on behalf of Saint John's School (Rodriguez-Ugarte, Nicole)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 19, 2020 to File Answer to Complaint or otherwise plead filed by Enrique R. Padro on behalf of Saint John's School Responses due by 2/18/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Padro, Enrique)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martha Ariza-Arias upon Saint John's School served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. (Vicens, Vanesa)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Saint John's School (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
December 20, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (ad)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of Martha Ariza-Arias (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of Martha Ariza-Arias (Vicens, Vanesa)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6728168.), filed by Martha Ariza-Arias. Service due by 3/18/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Indiano-Vicic, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ariza-Arias v. Saint John's School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint John's School
Represented By: Enrique R. Padro
Represented By: Nicole Marie Rodriguez-Ugarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joint Tortfeasors DEF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Ariza-Arias
Represented By: David C. Indiano-Vicic
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?