Scalia v. Alpha Telekom LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Defendant: Alpha Telekom LLC and Angel Gonzalez
Case Number: 3:2019cv02144
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Francisco A Besosa
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6 Motion for extension of time: GRANTED. Response to motion deadline March 9, 2020. No additional extensions will be allowed. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/12/2020. (brc)
February 12, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until March 9th, 2020 filed by Angel Munoz-Noya on behalf of Alpha Telekom LLC Responses due by 2/26/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Munoz-Noya, Angel)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda M. Wilmsen on behalf of Eugene Scalia (Wilmsen, Amanda)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia. Angel Gonzalez waiver sent on 12/20/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Glick, Jason)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia. Alpha Telekom LLC waiver sent on 12/20/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Glick, Jason)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alpha Telekom LLC, Angel Gonzalez (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
December 20, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (ad)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alpha Telekom LLC, Angel Gonzalez, filed by Eugene Scalia. Service due by 3/18/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons to Alpha Telekom LLC, #4 Summons to Angel Gonzalez)(Glick, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia v. Alpha Telekom LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpha Telekom LLC
Represented By: Angel Munoz-Noya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angel Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Jason E. Glick
Represented By: Amanda M. Wilmsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?