IRR Gas Station Corp. v. Puma Energy Caribe LLC
Plaintiff: IRR Gas Station Corp.
Defendant: Puma Energy Caribe LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02146
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Referring Judge: Camille L Velez-Rive
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 JUDGMENT. All claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, without any imposition of costs or attorney's fees. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on June 2, 2021. (ASE)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER. The Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal (Docket No. 63) is Granted. Consequently, all claims filed by Plaintiff against Defendant are dismissed with prejudice without the imposition of costs or attorney's fees. Each party will bear its own costs and expenses. The parties and their attorneys are commended for their efforts in reaching an agreement in good faith. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 06/02/2021.(cvr)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION of Dismissal Consent motion for voluntary dismissal by IRR Gas Station Corp.. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Settlement documents due on 6/7/2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 05/28/2021. (cvr)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 INFORMATIVE Motion regarding June 7, 2021, MOTION for Extension of Time until June 7, 2021 to file settlement documents filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 6/11/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Settlement documents due on 5/28/2021 Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 04/29/2021. (cvr)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 28, 2021 to file settlement documents filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 5/13/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #57 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/28/2021 to file settlement documents. Settlement documents due on 4/28/2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 4/20/2021. (ari)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/28/2021 to file settlement documents filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 5/4/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying #55 Motion to Stay. However, no deadlines will be set at this stage to allow the parties to continue in the settlement negotiations. If the case is not settled, the parties will then be asked to submit a discovery timetable for the Court's approval. Settlement documents due 4/23/2021. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 03/23/2021. (cvr)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION to Stay filed by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 4/5/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Estrella, Alberto)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #53 MOTION for extension of time until March 22, 2021. Joint Amended Rule 26 Joint Proposed Discovery Timetable to complete discovery due on 3/22/2021 for the Court's approval. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 3/12/2021. (ari)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MOTION for extension of time until March 22, 2021 filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of IRR Gas Station Corp. Responses due by 3/25/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. Joint Amended Rule 26 Joint Proposed DiscoveryTimetable to complete discovery due on 3/12/2021 for the Court's approval. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 03/01/2021. (cvr)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: By Order of Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (Docket No. 50), this case has been assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment as per 28 U.S.C. sec 636. All future pleadings shall bear only the initials of the Magistrate Judge next to the case number: Civil Case No. 19-2146 (CVR). Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi is no longer assigned to this case. Signed by Clerk on 03/01/2021. (ft)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER REFERRING CASE: The parties consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (Docket No. 28 at 2). Accordingly, this case is hereby REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Camille Velez-Rive for all further proceedings, including entry of judgment as per 28 U.S.C. sec. 636. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/1/2021. (CRH)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: Noted #48 Joint Motion In Compliance With Court's Order at Docket No. 43. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/1/2021. (CRH)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Joint Motion In Compliance With Court's Order at Docket No. 43 filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of IRR Gas Station Corp., Puma Energy Caribe LLC. Responses due by 3/12/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian) Modified on 3/1/2021 to add filer (ab).
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for extension of time. The parties are granted until 2/26/2021 to inform the outcone of the settlement negotiations. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 02/19/2021. (CVR)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Second MOTION for extension of time until February 29, 2021 to inform outcome of settlement negotiations filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 3/5/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #44 Motion for extension of time. The parties are granted until 2/19/2021 to inform the outcone of the settlement negotiations. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 02/12/2021. (CVR)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION for extension of time until February 19, 2021 to file joint motion informing outcome of the settlement negotiations filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 2/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive. Settlement Conference held on 2/8/2021 via Zoom. The following attorneys participated: Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez and Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez, for Plaintiff, and Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez and Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera, for Defendant. The parties have been engaged in settlement negotiations for some time and informed that they are close to reaching a settlement agreement. The general terms of the settlement agreement being discussed were explained to the undersigned. Additional time is needed to finalize the settlement negotiations. The parties were granted until 2/12/2021 to file a joint motion informing the outcome of the settlement negotiations. (cvr)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. A Settlement Conference is set for 2/8/2021 at 2:00 PM in VTC Bridge CVR before US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive via Zoom. Only the attorneys will participate during the Conference. The parties and/or their representatives with settlement authority shall be available to their attorneys via telephone during the Conference. Instructions on how to connect to the Zoom meeting will be provided by email in due course. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 12/28/2020. (cvr)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER: Noted #40 Joint Motion for Hearing Joint Motion Requesting a Settlement Conference Before the U.S.Magistrate Judge. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Camille Velez-Rive for a further settlement conference. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/28/2020. (CRH)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Joint MOTION for Hearing Joint Motion Requesting a Settlement Conference Before the U.S.Magistrate Judge filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of IRR Gas Station Corp. Responses due by 1/7/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive:Scheduling Conference held on 9/14/2020 via teleconference. The following attorneys participated by telephone: Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez for Plaintiff and Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez for Defendant. The Joint Initial Scheduling Conference Memorandum (Docket No. 38) was approved including the proposed discovery timetable at page 23 which is incorporated herein by reference and made part of this Minute. The parties do not consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge for further proceedings. The parties are actively engaged in settlement negotiations and were granted until 9/30/2020 to jointly inform the outcome of the settlement negotiations. The deadlines in Docket No. 38, page 23 will govern the proceedings if the case is not settled. (cvr)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Joint INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MEMORANDUM by All Parties. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian) Modified on 9/8/2020 to add filer (gmm).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Verified ANSWER to Complaint filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Defendant Puma Energy Caribe LLC.(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: Granting as requested #35 Motion for Extension of Time until August 31, 2020 to File Answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/26/2020. (CRH)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 31, 2020 to File Answer or otherwise plead filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 9/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: Granting as requested #32 Joint Motion for extension of time; Noted #33 Motion to clarify Clerical Mistake in Joint Motion for an Extension of Time at Docket No. 32. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/25/2020. (CRH)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Clarify Clerical Mistake in Joint Motion for an Extension of Time at Docket No. 32 filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of IRR Gas Station Corp. Responses due by 9/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Joint MOTION for extension of time until 09/03/2020 filed by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of IRR Gas Station Corp., Puma Energy Caribe LLC. Responses due by 9/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian) Modified on 8/25/2020 to add filer (gmm).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez on behalf of IRR Gas Station Corp. (Nieves-Rodriguez, Christian)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Granting as requested #29 Motion Extension of Time until August 25, 2020 to File Answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 8/6/2020. (CRH)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 25, 2020 to File Answer or otherwise plead filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 8/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Initial Settlement and Scheduling Conference is set for 9/14/2020 at 2:30 PM in Teleconference CVR before US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive. Instructions to the attorneys on how to connect to the telephone conference will be sent via email well in advance of the conference. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on 7/23/2020.(ari)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive for Initial Settlement and Scheduling Conference. Failure to comply in a timely manner with the deadline and directives detailed in this referral order may result in the imposition of sanctions. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/22/2020.(mg)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION & ORDER: Denying #9 Motion to Dismiss under Rules 12(b)(1) and (b)(6). Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/22/2020. (CRH) Modified on 7/22/2020 to edit docket title text as per Chambers request. (mg).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: Granting #24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Melissa Massheder-Torres terminated. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 7/21/2020. (AGF)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Melissa Massheder-Torres filed by Melissa Massheder-Torres on behalf of IRR Gas Station Corp. Responses due by 8/3/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Massheder-Torres, Melissa)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion to Dismiss (Docket #16) filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC Re: #9 MOTION to dismiss under Rules 12(b)(1) and (b)(6) as to Puma Energy Caribe LLC filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC. (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Noted and Granting #21 Motion submitting Certified English Translation of Exhibit 3. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 4/13/2020. (CRH)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION Submitting Certified English Translation of Exhibit 3 re: #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by IRR Gas Station Corp. filed by Melissa Massheder-Torres on behalf of IRR Gas Station Corp. Responses due by 4/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified English Translation of Exhibit at 16.3)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Massheder-Torres, Melissa)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: Denying #18 Motion to Strike IRR's response in opposition. Defendant may file a reply by March 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/3/2020. (CRH)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Spanish language documents (Motion for Leave to File a Spanish Language Document); Granting as requested #17 Motion for Extension of Time until March 19, 2020 (Extension of Time to File Certified English Translations. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 3/3/2020. (CRH)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Strike IRR's response in opposition, or in the alternative, for leave to file a reply and extension of time until March 23, 2020. Re: #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by IRR Gas Station Corp. filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 3/17/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #16 ) (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Spanish language documents (Motion for Leave to File a Spanish Language Document), MOTION for Extension of Time until March 19, 2020 (Extension of Time to File Certified English Translations) filed by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of IRR Gas Station Corp. Responses due by 3/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Plantiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant Puma Energy Caribe, LLC's Motion to Dismiss) filed by IRR Gas Station Corp. Re: #9 MOTION to dismiss under Rules 12(b)(1) and (b)(6) as to Puma Energy Caribe LLC filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC filed by IRR Gas Station Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Denying #13 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/26/2020. (CRH)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion (Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Strike at Docket No. 13) filed by IRR Gas Station Corp. Re: #13 MOTION to Strike Re: #11 Jury Demand filed by IRR Gas Station Corp. filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC filed by IRR Gas Station Corp.. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Strike Re: #11 Jury Demand filed by IRR Gas Station Corp. filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 2/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Granting as requested #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/6/2020. (AGF)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by IRR Gas Station Corp.. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance, MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss at Docket No. 9 by Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez on behalf of IRR Gas Station Corp. (Vicente-Gonzalez, Harold) Modified on 2/6/2020 to correct event (gmm).
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to dismiss under Rules 12(b)(1) and (b)(6) as to Puma Energy Caribe LLC filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 2/6/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lease Agreement Service Station 561, #2 Exhibit Lease Agreement Service Station 936, #3 Exhibit Deed of Rectification Service Station 936)(Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC (Estrella, Alberto)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk re: #7 Notice of Appearance. ***FILED IN ERROR. Lacking electronic signature and Certificate of Service. Counsel to re-file*** (gmm)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ***FILED IN ERROR-LACKING ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE*** NOTICE of Appearance by Alberto G. Estrella on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC (Estrella, Alberto) Modified on 12/27/2019 (gmm).
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Granting #3 Motion for extension of time. Granted as requested. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 12/26/2019. (MET)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for extension of time until January 23, 2020 to plead, answer or otherwise move filed by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC Responses due by 1/7/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance and request for notices by Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez on behalf of Puma Energy Caribe LLC (Ojeda-Diez, Francisco)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Tribunal de Primera Instancia, Sala Superior de Arecibo, case number AR2019CV02165. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0104-6729628), filed by Puma Energy Caribe LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Translation of Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit A-1 Complaint and Summons in Spanish, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Category Sheet)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IRR Gas Station Corp. v. Puma Energy Caribe LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puma Energy Caribe LLC
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Represented By: Francisco A. Ojeda-Diez
Represented By: Alberto G. Estrella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRR Gas Station Corp.
Represented By: Manuel Martinez-Umpierre
Represented By: Harold D. Vicente-Gonzalez
Represented By: Melissa Massheder-Torres
Represented By: Christian A. Nieves-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?