Kientz-Abreu v. Puerto Rico Ports Authority et al
Plaintiff: Karen Kientz-Abreu
Defendant: Mayra Garca-Irizarry, Puerto Rico Ports Authority, Jacqueline Cruz, Susana Figueroa, John Doe, Mayra Garcia and Insurance XYZ
Case Number: 3:2019cv02151
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Granting #8 "Special Notice of Appearance and Request for Extension of Time" & #9 "Notice of Appearance and Request for Extension of Time." Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead not later than March 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/11/2020. (MPL)
February 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE and MOTION for Extension of Time until March 12, 2020 to File Answer or motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 filed by Josue N. Torres-Crespo on behalf of Mayra Garcia Responses due by 2/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Crespo, Josue) Modified on 2/12/2020 to edit title (mcm).
February 11, 2020 Filing 8 Special NOTICE OF APPEARANCE and MOTION for Extension of Time until March 12, 2020 to File Answer or motion under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 and to allow the process of legal representation under Act 9 to conclude filed by Josue N. Torres-Crespo on behalf of Jacqueline Cruz, Susana Figueroa Responses due by 2/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Torres-Crespo, Josue) Modified on 2/12/2020 to edit title (mcm).
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #6 "Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or to Otherwise Plead." Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead not later than March 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 2/11/2020. (MPL)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until 03-12-2020 to File Answer re: #1 Complaint filed by Karen Kientz-Abreu filed by Heriberto Lopez-Guzman on behalf of Puerto Rico Ports Authority Responses due by 2/25/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Lopez-Guzman, Heriberto)
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jacqueline Cruz, Susana Figueroa, Mayra Garcia, Puerto Rico Ports Authority (Attachments: #1 Summons) (vdm)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Granting #3 "Motion for Issuance of Summons." The Clerk shall issue the summons accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/14/2020. (MPL)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants filed by Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 1/28/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jacqueline Cruz, #2 Summons Mayra Garca, #3 Summons PRPA, #4 Summons Susana Figueroa)(Rivera-Vaquer, Javier)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6731078.), filed by Karen Kientz-Abreu. Service due by 3/23/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Rivera-Vaquer, Javier)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kientz-Abreu v. Puerto Rico Ports Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayra Garca-Irizarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puerto Rico Ports Authority
Represented By: Heriberto Lopez-Guzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Cruz
Represented By: Josue N. Torres-Crespo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susana Figueroa
Represented By: Josue N. Torres-Crespo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayra Garcia
Represented By: Josue N. Torres-Crespo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance XYZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Kientz-Abreu
Represented By: Javier A. Rivera-Vaquer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?