United States of America v. Reyes Vazquez et al
Plaintiff: United States of America - Farm Service Agency and United States of America
Defendant: Joel H. Rivera, Estate of German Reyes Vazquez, Hilda Reyes Lozada, Estate of Felicita Lozada Maldonado, John Doe & Richard Roe and Beatriz M. Baez
Case Number: 3:2019cv02153
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Silvia Carreno-Coll
Referring Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America upon Joel H. Rivera served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America upon Hilda Reyes Lozada served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America upon Beatriz M. Baez served on 1/24/2020, answer due 2/14/2020. (Fortuno-Fas, Juan)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Granting as requested #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Silvia Carreno-Coll for pro bono appointment of counsel. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 2/18/2020. (AGF)
February 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time of 30 days to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, filed by Beatriz M. Baez, Hilda Reyes Lozada, Joel H. Rivera, All Pro se. Responses due by 2/26/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #1 ) (gmm)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Beatriz M. Baez, Hilda Reyes Lozada, Joel H. Rivera (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America - Farm Service Agency. Service due by 3/23/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Category Sheet, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Fortuno-Fas, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Reyes Vazquez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel H. Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of German Reyes Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilda Reyes Lozada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Felicita Lozada Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe & Richard Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beatriz M. Baez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America - Farm Service Agency
Represented By: Juan C. Fortuno-Fas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Juan C. Fortuno-Fas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?