Caballero v. Caribbean Medical Center-CDT et al
Plaintiff: Carmen R. Caballero, in representation of minor son CYCC and Carmen R. Caballero
Defendant: Dr. Omar Diaz-Sojo, CARIBBEAN MEDICAL CENTER-CDT, Moe-Foe Conjugal Partnerships I-X, Express Ambulance, Dr. John Doe, Dr. Victor M. Grillo-Leon, A, B, C Insurance Companies, Inc., James Roe and E, F, G Insurance Companies
Case Number: 3:2019cv02158
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Gustavo A Gelpi
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vicens, Vanesa)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Granting as requested #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi on 1/28/2020. (AGF)
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNTIL FEBRUARY 26TH, 2020 ON BEHALF OF DR VICTOR GRILLO AND DR OMAR DIAZ re: #6 Amended Complaint filed by Carmen R. Caballero filed by Ivonne Cruz-Serrano on behalf of Dr. Omar Diaz-Sojo Responses due by 2/10/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Cruz-Serrano, Ivonne)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Caribbean Medical Center-CDT served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020; Dr. Omar Diaz-Sojo served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020; Express Ambulance served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020; Dr. Victor M. Grillo-Leon served on 1/14/2020, answer due 2/4/2020. (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carmen R. Caballero.(Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm)
December 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CARIBBEAN MEDICAL CENTER-CDT, Dr. Omar Diaz-Sojo, Express Ambulance, Dr. Victor M. Grillo-Leon (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of Carmen R. Caballero, in representation of minor son CYCC (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6732874.), filed by Carmen R. Caballero, in representation of minor son CYCC. Service due by 3/25/2020, (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Williams-English, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caballero v. Caribbean Medical Center-CDT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Omar Diaz-Sojo
Represented By: Ivonne Cruz-Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARIBBEAN MEDICAL CENTER-CDT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moe-Foe Conjugal Partnerships I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Ambulance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Victor M. Grillo-Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A, B, C Insurance Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E, F, G Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen R. Caballero, in representation of minor son CYCC
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen R. Caballero
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?