Rodriguez-Rentas et al v. NSC TECHNOLOGIES LLC, D/B/A NSC et al
Plaintiff: Adrian Rodriguez-Rentas, Stephanie Rodriguez-Gali, Mayra Gali-Santiago and JRG, represented by his parents Adrian Rodriguez Rentas and Mayra Gali Santiago
Defendant: NSC TECHNOLOGIES LLC, D/B/A NSC, Moe-Foe Conjugal Partnerships I-X, HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY, VENDOR MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC, Dr. John Doe, A, B, C Insurance Companies, Inc., James Roe, E, F, G Insurance Companies, NSC Technologies LLC. and Vendor Management Services, LLC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02166
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Pedro A Delgado-Hernandez
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Granting #6 "Motion Requesting Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint or Plead." Appearing parties shall answer the complaint or otherwise plead by 3/12/2020. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 02/10/2020. (LMR)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time until March 12, 2020 to Answer the Complaint or Otherwise Plead filed by Margarita Rosado-Toledo on behalf of NSC TECHNOLOGIES LLC, D/B/A NSC, VENDOR MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC Responses due by 2/24/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Rosado-Toledo, Margarita)
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon NSC TECHNOLOGIES LLC, D/B/A NSC served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020; VENDOR MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020. (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY, NSC TECHNOLOGIES LLC, D/B/A NSC, VENDOR MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ad)
January 2, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT : Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (ad)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Vanesa Vicens on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vicens, Vanesa)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davila-Rodriguez, Christopher)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6734784.), filed by Stephanie Rodriguez-Gali, Mayra Gali-Santiago, JRG, represented by his parents Adrian Rodriguez Rentas and Mayra Gali Santiago, Adrian Rodriguez-Rentas. Service due by 3/30/2020, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Category Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons)(Williams-English, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez-Rentas et al v. NSC TECHNOLOGIES LLC, D/B/A NSC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSC TECHNOLOGIES LLC, D/B/A NSC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moe-Foe Conjugal Partnerships I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARTFORD INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VENDOR MANAGEMENT SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A, B, C Insurance Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Roe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E, F, G Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSC Technologies LLC.
Represented By: Margarita Rosado-Toledo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vendor Management Services, LLC.
Represented By: Margarita Rosado-Toledo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Rodriguez-Rentas
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Rodriguez-Gali
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayra Gali-Santiago
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JRG, represented by his parents Adrian Rodriguez Rentas and Mayra Gali Santiago
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Williams-English
Represented By: Vanesa Vicens
Represented By: Christopher A. Davila-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?