Betancourt-Espada et al v. Jorge N. Betancourt, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nahir Betancourt-Espada and Denise Betancourt-Espada
Defendant: Jorge N. Betancourt, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01002
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: William G Young
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Jaime Sifre-Rodriguez on behalf of Defendant Jorge N. Betancourt, Inc..(Sifre-Rodriguez, Jaime)
January 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Extension of Time by Jaime Sifre-Rodriguez on behalf of Jorge N. Betancourt, Inc. (Sifre-Rodriguez, Jaime) Modified on 1/21/2020 event, add text (gav).
January 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs upon Jorge N. Betancourt, Inc. served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. (Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Jorge N. Betancourt, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge William G. Young (arg)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jorge N. Betancourt, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6741170.), filed by Denise Betancourt-Espada, Nahir Betancourt-Espada. Service due by 4/8/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons)(Ramos-Luina, Guillermo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betancourt-Espada et al v. Jorge N. Betancourt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge N. Betancourt, Inc.
Represented By: Jaime Sifre-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nahir Betancourt-Espada
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Betancourt-Espada
Represented By: Guillermo J. Ramos-Luina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?