Starr Indemnity & Liability Company v. High Line Helicopters, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Defendant: High Line Helicopters, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01005
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Puerto Rico
Presiding Judge: Aida M Delgado-Colon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT. Case is HEREBY DISMISED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Clerk on 1/23/2020.(sr)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. Granted and So Ordered. The Clerk of Court is to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon on 1/22/2020.(wm)
January 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (San-Juan-DeMartino, Manuel)
January 13, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Aida M. Delgado-Colon (arg)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against High Line Helicopters, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6741856.), filed by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. Service due by 4/13/2020, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(San-Juan-DeMartino, Manuel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Puerto Rico District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company v. High Line Helicopters, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Line Helicopters, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Manuel San-Juan-DeMartino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?